KBM Worldwide, Inc. v. Noho, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur D Spatt |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-02794 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 06, 2015 7:39 AM EST |
Defendant
John Grdina
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noho, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KBM Worldwide, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Saturday, November 05, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order(Other)
Mon 11/07 2:53 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) with prejudice. Case to remain closed. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 11/5/2016. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 11/04 9:03 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by KBM Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/02 9:01 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by KBM Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Saturday, October 29, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/31 3:27 PM
ORDER re27 Letter advising of settlement. The Court is closing this case for administrative purposes, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. The parties are granted leave to move to reopen this matter in the event the settlement is not consummated. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 10/29/2016. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Sat 10/29 2:52 PM
ORDER re27 Letter filed by KBM Worldwide, Inc. In light of counsels' representation as to settlement of this matter, they are hereby directed to file an stipulation of discontinuance with the District Court within 30 days of the date of this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/29/2016. (Shields, Anne) |
||
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Fri 10/28 11:08 AM
Letter Letter advising of settlement by KBM Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
order
Pretrial Order
Thu 10/06 6:39 PM
Electronic ORDER re26 : Defendants are directed to respond to Plaintiff's outstanding discovery requests by 10/21/16. Defendants are warned that failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation to the District Court that Defendants' Answer be stricken and that default judgment be entered pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/6/2016. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Fri 09/30 11:32 AM
Letter Letter to Hon. Anne Y. Shields advising of status of settlement talks by KBM Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Discovery Hearing
Wed 09/14 2:16 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Discovery Conference held on 9/14/2016. See Minute Order for details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. (Tape #11:03-11:08.) (Torres, Jasmine) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 09/06 4:16 PM
Electronic ORDER granting24 Motion for Discovery Conference. The motion is granted to the extent that a status conference has been scheduled for 9/14/16 at 11:00am before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/6/2016. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Tuesday, August 30, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Discovery
Tue 08/30 3:23 PM
MOTION for Discovery Letter motion for discovery conference or other remedies by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 05/04 3:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Settlement Conference held on 5/2/2016. No Settlement was reached in this case. (Tape #2:12-3:54.) (Torres, Jasmine) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/02 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Samuel Feldman on behalf of KBM Worldwide, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Feldman, Bernard) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 03/30 9:46 AM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER re21 : The request to adjourn the status conference scheduled for 3/30/16 and convert it to a settlement conference is granted. A Settlement Conference is scheduled for 5/2/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Counsel are reminded to comply with the Individual Rules of Judge Shields regarding settlement conferences and, specifically, that parties and/or insurers with authority to settle must attend the settlement conference. If Counsel are unavailable on 5/2/16, they may make a motion to adjourn, which shall indicate three agreed upon suggested dates for the settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/30/2016. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Tue 03/29 8:06 PM
Letter Requesting Adjournment by John Grdina, Noho, Inc. (Lucero, Estevan) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
order
~Util - Set Hearings Scheduling Order
Wed 03/23 10:11 AM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference is scheduled for 3/30/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. If Parties believe a settlement conference would be fruitful, they may file a motion to adjourn, which shall list three suggested agreed upon dates for a 2:00pm settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/23/2016. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Tue 03/22 10:17 AM
Letter Letter providing status report to Hon. Anne Y. Shields by KBM Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 02/24 9:39 AM
Electronic STATUS REPORT ORDER: The Parties are directed to submit a joint Status letter on 3/22/2016. The letter shall indicate what depositions have taken place and whether any depositions remain. The letter shall also indicate whether counsel are in agreement that a settlement conference would be beneficial, and, if so, list three suggested agreed upon dates for the settlement conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/24/2016. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Tue 02/23 3:37 PM
Letter Status report to Magistrate Judge Shields by KBM Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 02/18 3:21 PM
Electronic STATUS REPORT ORDER. Parties have failed to comply with the scheduling order18 , which directed parties to submit a joint status letter by 2/15/16. Parties shall submit the joint status letter by 2/23/2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/18/2016. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/02 10:16 AM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling order submitted under DE18 is So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/2/2016. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Thursday, October 08, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Thu 10/08 2:48 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/8/2015. See Minute Order for details. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. (Tape #10:38-10:51.) (Torres, Jasmine) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/08 2:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re14 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by KBM Worldwide, Inc. The Proposed Scheduling Order is So Ordered. Status Conference set for 2/1/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/8/2015. (Torres, Jasmine) |
||
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/07 8:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lira on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lira, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Tue 10/06 2:29 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by KBM Worldwide, Inc. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/06 12:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Johnson on behalf of KBM Worldwide, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 09/29 10:43 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/28/2015. See Minute Order for details. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. (Tape #11:40-11:44.) (Torres, Jasmine) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 08/28 7:57 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is hereby adjourned, upon request and consent of the parties, to September 28, 2015 at 10:30 A.M. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/28/2015. (Shields, Anne) |
||
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 08/27 3:02 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by John Grdina, Noho, Inc.. (Lucero, Estevan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/30 3:19 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/31/2015 in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See Order and Attachment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/30/2015. (Torres, Jasmine) |
|
Att: 1 AYS Rules | ||
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/22 7:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Lucero, Estevan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/22 7:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Estevan Ramon Lucero on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Lucero, Estevan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Tue 07/21 12:01 PM
Electronic ORDER granting7 Motion for for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Estevan Lucero for Defendants NOHO, INC. and JOHN GRDINA. Counsel is directed to electronically file a notice of appearance and comply with all local rules. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/21/2015. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 07/20 2:23 PM
First MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by John Grdina, Noho, Inc.. (Lucero, Estevan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/14 12:02 PM
Electronic ORDER denying6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice. When renewing the motion, counsel is directed to comply with the Local Rules and to include a certificate of the court for each of the states in which counsel is a member of the bar, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing and states that the counsel is a member in good standing of the bar of that state court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/14/2015. (Casalini, Rosalinde) |
||
Monday, July 13, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/13 5:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7878735. by John Grdina, Noho, Inc.. (Lucero, Estevan) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 24, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/24 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. John Grdina served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/24 3:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. Noho, Inc. served on 6/18/2015, answer due 7/9/2015. (Johnson, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, June 09, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/09 4:28 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/09 4:26 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/09 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by KBM Worldwide, Inc.. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 06/09 4:27 PM
FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 17868 (Flanagan, Doreen) |