Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph F Leeson, Jr
Case #: 5:15-cv-03196
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2015
Terminated:Sep 21, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Dec 05, 2015 9:16 AM EST
Defendant
NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY
Represented By
ANNE E. MARTINEZ
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Plaintiff
ANITA HANSLER
Represented By
DERREK WILLIAM CUMMINGS
Mccarthy Weissberg Cummings, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/20 11:31 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ANITA HANSLER. (CUMMINGS, DERREK)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
10 10 order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 09/22 11:44 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/21/15. 9/22/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/21 11:33 AM
NOTICE by ANITA HANSLER Notice of Settlement (CUMMINGS, DERREK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2015
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 09/17 4:48 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 14, 2015, AT 9:30 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
7 7 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 09/16 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR Pretrial Conference held on 9/16/2015 (lbs, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 08/11 8:46 AM
NOTICE of SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 16, 2015, AT 9:30 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN COURTHOUSE AND FEDERAL BUILDING, COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA.(dja, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2015
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 08/10 6:24 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nestl Holdings, Inc. and Nestl S.A.. with Certificate of Service by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY.(MARTINEZ, ANNE)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/10 6:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint together with Separate Defenses by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY.(MARTINEZ, ANNE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/01 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE E. MARTINEZ on behalf of NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(MARTINEZ, ANNE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/16 2:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANITA HANSLER. NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY waiver sent on 6/9/2015, answer due 8/10/2015. (CUMMINGS, DERREK)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/09 10:21 AM
COMPLAINT against NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 122394.), filed by ANITA HANSLER.(jwl, )
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 06/09 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/9/15 (jwl, )
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 06/09 10:22 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANITA HANSLER. (jwl, )
Related: [-]