California Central District Court
Judge:Dean D Pregerson
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:15-cv-04347
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 09, 2015
Terminated:Dec 08, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Dec 06, 2015 3:34 AM PST
Defendant
August Bohanec
Represented By
Edward M Robbins, Jr
Hochman Salkin Rettig Toscher And Perez PC
contact info
Robert S Horwitz
Hochman Salkin Rettig Toscher And Perez PC
contact info
Defendant
Maria Bohanec
Represented By
Edward M Robbins, Jr
Hochman Salkin Rettig Toscher And Perez PC
contact info
Robert S Horwitz
Hochman Salkin Rettig Toscher And Perez PC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Andrew Pribe
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, August 03, 2017
42 42 misc Abstract of Judgment issued Thu 08/03 4:35 PM
ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against August Bohanec in the principal amount of $160,915.75, interest in the amount of $6,480.70, attorneys fees of $38,752.30, costs of $0.00. RE: Judgment,40 (shb)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Abstract of Judgment issued Thu 08/03 4:33 PM
ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Plaintiff United States of America and against Maria Bohanec in the principal amount of $160,915.75, interest in the amount of $6,480.70, attorneys fees of $38,752.30, costs of $0.00. RE: Judgment,40 (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
40 40 judgmentCV Judgment Tue 12/20 2:31 PM
JUDGMENT39 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: 1. Judgment is entered in favor of the United States of America and against August Bohanec in the amount of $160,915.75 plus all statutory accruals including interest and penalties plus costs and expenses. 2. Judgment is entered in favor of the United States of America and against Maria Bohanec in the amount of $160,915.75 plus all statutory accruals including interest and penalties plus costs and expenses (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
39 39 stip Judgment Mon 12/19 9:53 AM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 [Proposed] Judgment
Thursday, December 08, 2016
38 38 order Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Thu 12/08 3:04 PM
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Defendants failure to timely file an FBAR for 2007 was willful. The maximum penalty is therefore increased to the greater of $100,000 or fifty percent of the balance in the foreign accounts on June 30, 2008.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2016
37 37 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 12/02 3:05 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/01/2016; 9:12 A.M. re Transcript36 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Bustillos, Maria)
Related: [-]
36 36 transcript -Transcript Fri 12/02 3:03 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/01/2016; 9:12 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARIA BUSTILLOS, phone number MADAMCOURTREPORTER@GMAIL.COM FOR ALL TRANSCRIPT REQUESTS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through MARIA BUSTILLOS. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2017. (Bustillos, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2016
34 34 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 11/14 5:04 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR:By Judge Dean D. Pregerson; The Minutes of Court Trial filed November 1, 2016 (docket no. 260) was inadvertently filed under the wrong case number and does not pertain to this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
33 33 transcript Transcript Order Form (G-120) Wed 11/09 11:35 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants August Bohanec, Maria Bohanec for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jessica Crenshaw at jc@taxlitigator.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Robbins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2016
32 32 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 11/07 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re Pretrial Conference Order - Final25(Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 United States of America's Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
31 31 notice Notice of Lodging Mon 11/07 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed 11/07/2016 re Pretrial Conference Order - Final25(Robbins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
35 35 minutes Bench Trial - (ONE Day) Tue 11/15 3:16 PM
MINUTES OF Court Trial (1st Day) held and completed before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Opening statements waived. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff rests. Defendants Rest. Findings, Conclusions of Law and Judgment to be prepared by defendant. Case Submitted. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (lc)
Related: [-]
30 30 trial Exhibit List Fri 11/04 9:08 AM
TRIAL EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST FILED. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2016
29 29 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 10/31 10:52 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Pregerson will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9C on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
28 28 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Wed 10/26 12:07 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document27 , pdf is a proposed findings of fact etc. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Proposed findings of fact etc was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
27 27 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 10/25 4:35 PM
United States of America's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
26 26 trial Trial Brief Tue 10/25 4:25 PM
TRIAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
25 25 order Pretrial Conference Order - Final Tue 10/25 10:49 AM
FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. See order for details. (jy)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Pretrial Conference - Final Tue 10/25 10:46 AM
MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Court conducts the Final Pretrial Conference. The bench trial remains scheduled Tuesday, November 1, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (jy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2016
23 23 notice Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Thu 10/13 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff United States of America.(Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Proposed) Final Pretrial Conference Order
Monday, October 03, 2016
22 22 7 pgs trial Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law Mon 10/03 5:53 PM
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant August Bohanec. (Robbins, Edward)
Related: [-]
21 21 6 pgs trial Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law Mon 10/03 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
20 20 trial Witness List Mon 10/03 4:17 PM
Witness List filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
19 19 trial Exhibit List Mon 10/03 4:15 PM
JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2016
18 18 order Order Mon 09/19 2:11 PM
ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Based on the stipulation17 of the parties and for good cause shown, the parties are relieved of their obligation to participate in mandatory alternative dispute resolution. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2016
17 17 stip Order Thu 09/15 2:40 PM
STIPULATION for Order Granting Request for Relief from Mandatory Mediation filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 04, 2015
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/04 3:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Pursuant to FRCP 16(b): Counsel must agree on date for the disclosure of expert witness reports pursuant to FRCP 26(a)2; Discovery cut-off 6/30/2016; Motions due by 8/1/2016; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2016 11:00 AM ; Court Trial set for 11/1/2016 09:00 AM. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
15 15 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) Tue 11/03 3:38 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for Settlement Conference. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 11/03 9:23 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Court and counsel confer re case status. Court sets trial dates. Related [+]Court Reporter: none. (lc)
Related: [-] fer to the SCHEDULING ORDER to be issued hereafter.
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 11/02 11:54 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert S Horwitz counsel for Defendants August Bohanec, Maria Bohanec. Adding Robert S. Horwitz as counsel of record for August Bohanec and Maria Bohanec for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants August Bohanec and Maria Bohanec. (Attorney Robert S Horwitz added to party August Bohanec(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Horwitz added to party Maria Bohanec(pty:dft))(Horwitz, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/26 1:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE shall be heard on the current date of November 2, 2015 at the new time of 1:30 p.m. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 10/20 1:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is hereby continued from October 29, 2015 to Monday, November 2, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. (jre)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2015
10 10 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 10/15 10:57 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/29 3:56 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson; Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2015 at 03:00 PM. This matter is set for a scheduling conference in Courtroom 3, before the Honorable Dean D. Pregerson, located at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. The conference will beheld pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). Lead trial counsel shall attend the scheduling conference. (See Order for further details) (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2015
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/27 1:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendants August Bohanec, Maria Bohanec.(Attorney Edward M Robbins, Jr added to party August Bohanec(pty:dft), Attorney Edward M Robbins, Jr added to party Maria Bohanec(pty:dft))(Robbins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
7 7 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 06/18 10:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/09 3:52 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants August Bohanec, Maria Bohanec. (jp)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 06/09 3:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 06/09 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jp)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 06/09 1:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 06/09 1:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 06/09 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Andrew Pribe added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Pribe, Andrew)
Related: [-]