ATTIAS et al v. CAREFIRST, INC. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher R Cooper |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00882 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 05:552 Right to Privacy Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2015 |
Re-opened: | May 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 07, 2015 8:30 AM EST |
Defendant
CAREFIRST BLUECHOICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREFIRST, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GROUP HOSPITALIZATION AND MEDICAL SERVICES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREFIRST OF MARYLAND, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHANTAL ATTIAS
Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 1220 N St., NW
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LATANYA BAILEY
Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 2 Broomfield Dr.
Stafford, VA 22554 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD BAILEY
Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 2 Broomfield Dr.
Stafford, VA 22554 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LISA HUBER
Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 1824 Weyburn Road
Baltimore, MD 21237 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREAS KOTZUR
Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated 1220 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CONNIE TRINGKER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CURT TRINGLER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
111 | 111
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/26 3:57 PM
NOTICE [Joint Status Report] by CAREFIRST BLUECHOICE, CAREFIRST OF MARYLAND, INC. re110 Memorandum & Opinion,, Order,, Status Report Order, (Gatewood, Matthew) |