Housley v. PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Referred: | Christine A Nowak |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-00393 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 08, 2015 7:33 AM CST |
Defendant
PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank
McGlinchey Stafford 2711 N. Haskell Ave Ste 2750 LB 38
Dallas, TX 75204 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erika B. Housley
5912 Pine Meadow Lane
McKinney, TX 75070 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, November 17, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 11/17 12:48 PM
MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for15 Report and Recommendation,3 Motion to Dismiss filed by PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #3) is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. All relief not previously granted is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this civil action. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/17/2015. (kls, ) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Sun 10/25 4:26 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Erika B. Housley as to15 Report and Recommendation. (kls, ) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report and Recommendations
Thu 10/15 1:54 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank. Based upon the findings discussed above, the Court RECOMMENDS that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 3] be GRANTED and Plaintiff's case be DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/15/2015. (kls, ) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/14 1:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for September 22, 2015, is CANCELLED Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2015 and 1/8/2016 for Defendants. Discovery due by 3/11/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2015. Jury instructions or Proposed Findings of Fact due by 7/15/2016 Mediation Completion due by 4/8/2016. Motions due by 3/18/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order and Motions in limine due by 7/25/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 9/14/2015. (pad, ) |
|
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 08/31 12:36 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Anderson, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Mon 08/31 9:41 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Erika B. Housley as to11 Order. (kls, ) |
|
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/30 1:32 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. This Order shall govern proceedings in this case. The following deadlines are hereby set: Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: August 14, 2015. File joint report of attorney conference: August 31, 2015. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference before the undersigned on September 22, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. at the U. S. Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Travis Street, Chase Bank Building, Mezzanine Level, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/30/2015. (kls, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/23 10:43 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/23/2015. (pad, ) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Mon 06/22 4:43 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Erika B. Housley as to6 Order. (baf, ) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 06/22 8:45 AM
ORDER re7 Notice of Related Cases. It is ORDERED that this cause of action is hereby transferred to the Hon. Amos Mazzant for all further proceedings. Case reassigned to Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III for all further proceedings. Judge Ron Clark no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 6/20/2015. (baf, ) |
|
Monday, June 15, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/15 4:02 PM
NOTICE by PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (Anderson, Nathan) |
|
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Fri 06/12 4:13 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/12/2015. (kls, ) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/12 9:27 AM
***ORIGINAL PETITION FILED IN COLLIN COUNTY, TEXAS, 219TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT*** COMPLAINT against PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank, filed by Erika B. Housley.(kls, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Fri 06/12 9:24 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . ***Consent Form mailed to Plaintiff. (kls, ) |
||
Thursday, June 11, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/12 9:23 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Ron Clark and Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. (kls, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Referral | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Thu 06/11 1:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank.(Anderson, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Ex A, | ||
Att: 2 Ex B, | ||
Att: 3 Ex C, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/11 10:40 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank. (Anderson, Nathan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/11 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank from 219th District Court of Collin County, case number 219-02169-2015. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5240108), filed by PNC Mortgage, a division of PNC Bank, N.A., successor by merger to National City Bank.(Anderson, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Ex A - Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Ex A - Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Ex A - TRO, | ||
Att: 4 Ex A - Bond/Writ, | ||
Att: 5 Ex B, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Coversheet, | ||
Att: 7 Supplemental Coversheet |