Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Case #: 2:15-cv-00415
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2015
Terminated:Jul 05, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 09, 2015 6:11 AM MST
Defendant
Solomon Jalloh
Defendant
Zion Capital Ventures
Plaintiff
Zions Direct
Represented By
Mark L. Smith
Smith Correll LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Zions First National Bank
Represented By
Mark L. Smith
Smith Correll LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
16 16 misc Report Regarding Patent and Trademark Tue 07/05 3:43 PM
Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (alt)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Judgment - Default Permanent Injunction Tue 07/05 3:05 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT for PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Zions Direct, Zions First National Bank and against Zion Capital Ventures, Solomon Jalloh - CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/5/16 (alt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
14 14 motion Default Judgment Wed 06/29 3:33 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) Defs. Zion Capital Ventures, LLP and Solomon Jalloh, a/k/a Suliman Jalloh and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Zions Direct, Zions First National Bank.(Smith, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment
Wednesday, December 30, 2015
13 13 order Order Wed 12/30 1:24 PM
ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT. The court GRANTS Plaintiffs Request and ORDERS the Clerk of Court to enter default against Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/29/2015. (jds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2015
12 12 order Clerks Entry of Default Certificate Wed 12/30 10:21 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT CERTIFICATE as to Solomon Jalloh, Zion Capital Ventures (las)
Related: [-]
11 11 utility Reassignment to District Judge Tue 12/29 12:05 PM
After review of the case, case reassigned to District Judge per 10 Docket Text Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (las)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Tue 12/29 11:28 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case, the pending 9 Request for Entry of Default filed by Zions Direct, Zions First National Bank and the inability of certain defendants to consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge because they have not pled or otherwise defended this case, the court ORDERS this case be reassigned to a district judge. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 12/29/2015. No attached document. (lam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2015
9 9 misc Request Wed 12/23 7:10 PM
REQUEST for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiffs Zions Direct, Zions First National Bank.(Smith, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Correll Decl.
8 8 service Service by Publication Wed 12/23 6:43 PM
SERVICE by Publication filed by Zions Direct, Zions First National Bank. Last publication date November 19, 2015.(Smith, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Certificate of Publication
Tuesday, October 06, 2015
7 7 order Order on Motion for Service by Publication Tue 10/06 2:21 PM
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/6/2015. (las)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2015
6 6 motion Service by Publication Mon 10/05 3:45 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication and Memorandum in Support and Correll Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiffs Zions Direct, Zions First National Bank.(Smith, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - MD Secretary of State Information,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Decl. of Non-Service No. 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Decl. of Non-Service No. 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Certified Mail Receipts,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Defs.' Website,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Decl. of Non-Service No. 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Sept. 3, 2015 email to Schamel,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Sept. 3, 2015 email from Schamel,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Sept. 22, 2015 email from Schamel,
Att: 10 Text of Proposed Order Pls.' Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
5 5 service Summons Issued Electronically Wed 06/17 1:49 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Zion Capital Ventures. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (bdr)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Electronically Wed 06/17 1:48 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Solomon Jalloh. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (bdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
3 3 misc Report Regarding Patent and Trademark Mon 06/15 10:07 AM
Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mms)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 06/12 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2282662), filed by Zions First National Bank, Zions Direct. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Smith, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Fri 06/12 9:11 AM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiffs Zions Direct, Zions First National Bank is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mms)
Related: [-]