Washington Western District Court
Judge:Marsha J Pechman
Case #: 2:15-cv-00939
Nature of Suit720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations
CauseLabor/Mgt. Relations
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2015
Terminated:Nov 20, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 09, 2015 5:38 AM PST
Defendant
Safeway, Inc.
Represented By
Katheryn Bradley
Lane Powell PC
contact info
D Michael Reilly
Lane Powell PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Swaw
Represented By
Thaddeus P Martin
Thaddeus P Martin & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Safeway Beverage Plant
Terminated: 09/02/2015
Represented By
Katheryn Bradley
Lane Powell PC
contact info
D Michael Reilly
Lane Powell PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, November 20, 2015
19 19 order Judgment by Court Fri 11/20 9:52 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED. (PM)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 11/20 9:49 AM
ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman granting defendant's9 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (PM)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/02 3:32 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Safeway, Inc., TO RESPONSE to9 MOTION to Dismiss (Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2015
16 16 respm Declaration Mon 09/28 12:49 PM
DECLARATION of Thaddeus P. Martin filed by Plaintiff Michael Swaw re9 MOTION to Dismiss(Martin, Thaddeus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D
15 15 respm Response to Motion Mon 09/28 12:46 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Michael Swaw, to9 MOTION to Dismiss .(Martin, Thaddeus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
utility Terminate Motions (Public, notice to parties) Tue 09/08 9:59 AM
***Motion terminated per Stipulated Order14 :7 Stipulated MOTION for Order for Dismissal of Defendant Safeway Beverage Plant filed by Safeway, Inc., Safeway Beverage Plant. (PM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
14 14 order Order Dismissing Party Wed 09/02 2:07 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Safeway Beverage Plant by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
Related: [-]
13 13 order MJP Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates Wed 09/02 8:33 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 8/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2015, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/25/2016, Motions due by 2/24/2016, Discovery completed by 3/25/2016, Dispositive motions due by 4/25/2016, Motions in Limine due by 7/18/2016, Pretrial Order due by 8/10/2016, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/10/2016, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/10/2016, Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
12 12 notice Notice of Motion Re-Noted Fri 08/28 2:38 PM
NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED:9 MOTION to Dismiss . Filed by Defendant Safeway, Inc.. Noting Date 10/2/2015, (Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
11 11 notice Notice of Unavailability Wed 08/26 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Thaddeus P Martin for Plaintiff Michael Swaw from 09/11/15-09/20/15. (Martin, Thaddeus)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2015
10 10 respm Declaration Mon 08/24 4:58 PM
DECLARATION of Katheryn Bradley filed by Defendant Safeway, Inc. re9 MOTION to Dismiss (Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 08/24 4:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Safeway, Inc.. Noting Date 9/18/2015, (Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 18, 2015
8 8 misc Joint Status Report Tue 08/18 11:53 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. (Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 08/18 11:48 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Order for Dismissal of Defendant Safeway Beverage Plant by Defendants Safeway Beverage Plant, Safeway, Inc.. Noting Date 8/18/2015, (Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
6 6 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Tue 07/14 8:57 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2015, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/11/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/18/2015, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2015
5 5 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/18 11:37 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeway Beverage Plant, Safeway, Inc. (Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
4 4 misc Jury Demand Mon 06/15 11:14 AM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Michael Swaw (Martin, Thaddeus)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Judge Assignment Letter Mon 06/15 11:07 AM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MKB)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/15 11:05 AM
Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (MKB)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
2 2 misc Verification of State Court Records Fri 06/12 4:11 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Safeway Beverage Plant, Safeway, Inc.(Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-F
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 06/12 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 15 2-11818 Related [+], filed by Safeway, Inc., Safeway Beverage Plant.(Bradley, Katheryn)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-4052137
Att: 1 Exhibit A-H,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Complaint