ADT v. Alarm Protection Technology Fl, et al
Original Case: 9:12-cv-80898
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-prici-12650 |
Type | private civil / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 28, 2016 6:48 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
ALARM PROTECTION TECHNOLOGY FLORIDA, LLC, a Florida limited liability company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JACOB DAHL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ADAM DALTON SCHANZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ALARM PROTECTION TECHNOLOGY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ALARM PROTECTION TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ALARM PROTECTION TECHNOLOGY MANAGEMENT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ADT LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 24 2016
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant ADT in 15-12650. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. [15-11277, 15-12650] |
Docket last updated: 03/28/2016 6:48 AM EDT |