Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08097
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2015
Terminated:Jan 09, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems, an Indiana corporation
11800 Exit Five Parkway, St. 106
Fishers, IN 46037
Represented By
PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, January 09, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Mon 01/09 9:37 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8097 Judgment For Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8097 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
28 28 order Stipulated Order Fri 01/06 3:15 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/6/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 27
Thursday, December 29, 2016
27 27 motion Stipulation Thu 12/29 3:04 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceedings Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
26 26 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 3:07 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
25 25 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 1:13 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number23 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 23 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 12:33 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 2:28 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 2:28 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
22 22 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:22 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 21 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
21 21 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 3:38 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
20 20 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:30 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2015
19 19 order Withdrawal of Reference Fri 10/09 10:10 AM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+] The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and dispositive motions. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill 10/7/2015. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (drh)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, September 28, 2015
18 18 notice Notice Mon 09/28 9:05 AM
The District Court misc file has closed; A civil case has been opened: 4:15-cv-00442-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by Dana R. Hoyle, Deputy Clerk. (drh)
Related: [-] 16 Notice 16 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08241-BLW. No PDF Attached (related documents9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) Filed by (RE: related document(s)9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems). (drh)
Monday, September 14, 2015
17 17 misc Statement of Compliance Mon 09/14 2:07 PM
Statement of Compliance Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, August 19, 2015
16 16 notice Notice Wed 08/19 2:09 PM
Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08241-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems
15 15 court Court's Certificate of Service Wed 08/19 1:57 PM
Court's Certificate of Service re6 Order (Generic), 14 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Daniel N. DeLay Mercho Caughey & DeLay 828 E. 64th St. Indianapolis, IN 46220 Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic), 14 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application
14 14 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 08/19 1:55 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Daniel N. DeLay by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/19/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 11
13 13 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 08/19 9:38 AM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08097 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5616256. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#11
12 12 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 08/19 9:38 AM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-08097 JDP) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5616256. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#9
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/19 9:37 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Defendant PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Support Brief/Memorandum Wed 08/19 9:34 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Filed by Defendant PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems Related [+]. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176
9 9 motion Withdrawal of Reference Wed 08/19 9:21 AM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorney Wed 08/19 1:56 PM
Attorney Daniel N. DeLay for PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems added to case (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Mon 08/17 9:12 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/17 9:00 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2015
6 6 order Order (Generic) Fri 08/14 3:53 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 8/14/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/13 5:05 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jed W Manwaring Filed by Defendant PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/16 11:30 AM
Summons Service Executed on PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems 6/16/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
3 3 Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015; PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 13, 2015
2 2 Receipt of Complaint 15-08097 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5530865. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 12, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08097 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against PH2T, Inc. dba Integrated Packaged Systems, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons