Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08105
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2015
Terminated:Jan 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
WorleyParsons Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation
6330 West Loop South, Suite 1303
Bellaire, TX 77401
Represented By
WorleyParsons Group, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/17 4:16 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8105 Judgment For Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8105 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
26 26 order Stipulated Order Fri 01/13 4:57 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 motion Stipulation Fri 01/13 3:33 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceedings Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
24 24 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 3:17 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
23 23 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 1:25 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number21 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 21 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 12:43 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 2:54 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 2:53 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
20 20 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:26 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 19 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
19 19 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 3:54 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
18 18 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:36 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2015
17 17 misc Consent Mon 09/14 2:19 PM
Consent Filed by Defendant WorleyParsons Group, Inc.. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
16 16 misc Consent Wed 09/02 9:13 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
15 15 court Court's Certificate of Service Mon 08/31 3:07 PM
Court's Certificate of Service re 12 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application, 13 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application,14 Order (Generic) A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Jason S. Brookner, Esq. /Lydia R. Webb, Esq. Gray Reed & McGraw, P.C. 1601 Elm St, Ste 4600 Dallas, TX 75201 Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant WorleyParsons Group, Inc., 13 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant WorleyParsons Group, Inc., 14 Order (Generic)
14 14 order Order (Generic) Mon 08/31 3:06 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 8/31/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Mon 08/31 3:01 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Lydia R. Webb by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/31/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 8
12 12 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Mon 08/31 2:58 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Jason S. Brookner by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/31/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 6
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/31 2:51 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant WorleyParsons Group, Inc. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 08/31 2:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Rule 12(b)(6) Filed by Defendant WorleyParsons Group, Inc. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 supporting brief
9 9 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 08/31 2:14 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08105 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5633627. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#8
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/31 2:12 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lydia R. Webb Filed by Defendant WorleyParsons Group, Inc. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
7 7 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 08/31 2:10 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08105 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5633614. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#6
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/31 2:07 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason S. Booker Filed by Defendant WorleyParsons Group, Inc. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/28 3:41 PM
Notice of Appearance by R Ron Kerl Filed by Defendant WorleyParsons Group, Inc.. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/16 4:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on WorleyParsons Group, Inc. 6/16/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
3 3 Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015; WorleyParsons Group, Inc. Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Complaint 15-08105 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5531298. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Saturday, June 13, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08105 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against WorleyParsons Group, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons