Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08107
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Expeditors International of Washington, Inc., a Washington corporation
1136 S. 3600 W., Bldg. No. 2, Ste. 400
Salt Lake City, UT 84101
Represented By
Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/31 4:46 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8107 Judgment For - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8107 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
17 17 order Stipulated Order Mon 01/30 4:34 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/30/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 16
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
16 16 motion Stipulation Tue 01/17 11:48 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
15 15 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 3:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
14 14 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 1:27 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number12 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 12 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 12:51 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 3:03 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 3:02 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
11 11 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:27 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 10 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
10 10 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 4:00 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
9 9 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:38 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/21 12:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. (Davis, Bart)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
7 7 misc Consent Mon 08/03 10:59 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
6 6 order Order (Generic) Wed 07/29 4:56 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/29/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2015
5 5 notice Notice Fri 07/17 1:50 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.. (Davis, Bart)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/16 4:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. 6/16/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
3 3 Summons Issued on Expeditors Internaitional of Washington, Inc. Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Complaint 15-08107 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5531298. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Saturday, June 13, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08107 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Expeditors Internaitional of Washington, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons