Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08111
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2015
Terminated:Feb 07, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
K2 Construction, Inc., an Idaho Corporation
8555 W. Hackamore Drive, Suite 200
Boise, ID 83709
Represented By
K2 Construction, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 02/07 10:43 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8111 Judgment For N/A - Case Settled., Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8111 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
23 23 order Stipulated Order Mon 02/06 3:12 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 2/6/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 motion Stipulation Mon 02/06 1:13 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
21 21 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 3:22 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
20 20 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 1:29 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number18 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 18 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 12:59 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 3:17 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 3:17 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
17 17 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:29 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 16 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
16 16 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 4:08 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2016
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/06 2:03 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant K2 Construction, Inc.. (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
14 14 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:40 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2015
13 13 order Withdrawal of Reference Fri 10/09 10:19 AM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+] The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and dispositive motions. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill 10/7/2015. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (drh)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
12 12 notice Notice Wed 09/09 2:47 PM
The District Court misc file has closed; A civil case has been opened: 4:15-cv-00381-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by Dana R Hoyle. (drh)
Related: [-] 10 Notice 10 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08224-BLW. No PDF Attached (related documents8 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) Filed by (RE: related document(s)8 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant K2 Construction, Inc.). (drh)
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
11 11 misc Statement of Compliance Tue 09/01 4:17 PM
Statement of Compliance Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic)
Friday, August 14, 2015
10 10 notice Notice Fri 08/14 10:25 AM
Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08224-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference8 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant K2 Construction, Inc.
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
9 9 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 08/12 1:18 PM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-08111 JDP) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5608530. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#8
8 8 motion Withdrawal of Reference Wed 08/12 1:16 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant K2 Construction, Inc. (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
7 7 misc Consent Mon 08/03 11:02 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
6 6 order Order (Generic) Wed 07/29 4:58 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/29/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/30 1:35 PM
Notice of Appearance by Patrick John Geile Filed by Defendant K2 Construction, Inc.. (Geile, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/16 4:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on K2 Construction, Inc. 6/16/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
3 3 Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015; K2 Construction, Inc. Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Complaint 15-08111 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5531298. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Saturday, June 13, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08111 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against K2 Construction, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons