Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08116
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2015
Terminated:Dec 21, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rig Runners, Inc., a Texas corporation
525 N. Sam Houston Pkwy. E., Ste. 523
Houston, TX 77060
Represented By
Rig Runners, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Wed 12/21 9:34 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8116 Judgment For N/A; Case Settled, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8116 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
27 27 order Stipulated Order Tue 12/20 5:12 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 12/20/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 26
26 26 motion Stipulation Tue 12/20 9:51 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
25 25 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 3:43 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 22
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
24 24 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 1:34 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number22 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 22 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 1:11 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 4:51 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 4:50 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
21 21 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:33 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 20 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
20 20 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 4:20 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
19 19 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:45 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2015
18 18 utility Substitution of Attorney Mon 10/19 4:02 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Daniel C Green Terminated Filed by Defendant Rig Runners, Inc.. (Olsen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
17 17 answer Response Wed 09/23 2:35 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) 13 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP)
Monday, September 21, 2015
16 16 misc Support Brief/Memorandum Mon 09/21 11:16 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Rig Runners, Inc. Related [+]. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Dismiss Case
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 09/21 11:15 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Defendant Rig Runners, Inc. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
14 14 misc Consent Wed 09/02 9:06 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) Wed 09/02 8:36 AM
Notice of Conditional Dismissal UPON EXAMINATION of the record herein, the Court finds that cause exists to believe that the parties are NOT diligently prosecuting this adversary case. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that pursuant to Local Rule 7041.1 relating to dismissal in inactive cases, the above entitled case will be DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION unless a party takes further action in accordance with Local Rule 7041.1(a). Elizabeth A. Smith, Clerk of Court This is the Official Notice from the Court. No Document is attached Adversary Action due by 9/23/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
12 12 court Court's Certificate of Service Fri 08/28 2:17 PM
Court's Certificate of Service re 9 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application, 10 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application,11 Order (Generic) A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Robert K. Dakis Esq and Joseph T Moldavan Esq Morrison Cohen LLP 909 Third Ave New York, NY 10022 Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant Rig Runners, Inc., 10 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant Rig Runners, Inc., 11 Order (Generic)
11 11 order Order (Generic) Fri 08/28 2:14 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 8/28/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 08/28 2:10 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Joseph T. Moldovan by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/28/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 6
9 9 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 08/28 2:08 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Robert K. Dakis by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/28/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, August 27, 2015
8 8 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 08/27 12:10 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08116 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5628265. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#6
7 7 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 08/27 12:10 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08116 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5628265. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#5
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/27 12:09 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Defendant Rig Runners, Inc. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/27 12:08 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Defendant Rig Runners, Inc. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/16 5:10 PM
Summons Service Executed on Rig Runners, Inc. 6/16/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
3 3 Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015; Rig Runners, Inc. Date Issued 6/15/2015, Answer Due 7/15/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Complaint 15-08116 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5531298. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Saturday, June 13, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08116 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Rig Runners, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons