Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:15-bk-50047

North Carolina Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laura T Beyer
Case #: 5:15-ap-05014
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 12, 2015
Terminated:Dec 22, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Randy W. Burke
Represented By
Randy W. Burke
contact info
Defendant
Patricia C. Burke
Represented By
Patricia C. Burke
contact info
Plaintiff
Hilda P. James
Represented By
Ronald K Payne
Long Parker Warren Anderson Payne PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, December 22, 2016
11 11 order Other Thu 12/22 8:48 AM
Agreed Order that debt is not dischargeable. Related [+] (krt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Hilda P. James
utility Close Case Thu 12/22 8:50 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed. (krt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 10, 2016
10 10 audio Audio MP3 Sat 12/10 4:00 PM
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
court Disposition of Hearing/Trial Mon 12/12 10:43 AM
Disposition of Hearing Held before the Honorable Laura T. Beyer: CONSENT ORDER CIRCULATING; DEBT IS NONDISCHARGEABLE Related [+]. Order due by 1/11/2017, (jlb)
Related: [-] 8 Court Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
9 9 notice BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/24 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Court Notice of Hearing
Monday, November 21, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 11/21 2:21 PM
Court Notice of Status Hearing Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 12/9/2016 at 10:30 AM at 5-Statesville Main Courtroom. (krt)
Related: [-] 7 Order (other)
Friday, August 28, 2015
7 7 order Other Fri 08/28 9:25 AM
Consent Order Granting Relief from Stay and Staying Adversary Proceeding. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2015
6 6 order Extend Mon 08/17 2:24 PM
Ex Parte Order Granting Motion To Extend Time to File Answer by Patricia C. Burke Answer Due 9/14/2015; Randy W. Burke Answer Due 9/14/2015 Related [+] (nms)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, August 14, 2015
5 5 motion Extend Fri 08/14 12:51 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. filed by Kerry L. Balentine on behalf of Patricia C. Burke, Randy W. Burke. (Balentine, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
4 4 order Extend Tue 07/14 4:37 PM
Ex Parte Order Granting Motion To Extend Time to File Answer by Patricia C. Burke Answer Due 8/14/2015; Randy W. Burke Answer Due 8/14/2015 Related [+] (nms)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 motion Extend Tue 07/14 12:58 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. filed by Kerry L. Balentine on behalf of Patricia C. Burke, Randy W. Burke. (Balentine, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
2 2 Summons Issued on Randy W. Burke Answer Due 07/15/2015; Patricia C. Burke Answer Due 07/15/2015. (jra)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-05014 Complaint 14 by Hilda P. James against Randy W Burke, Patricia C Burke - Fee Amount $ 350. Pre-Trial Order due by 10/13/2015. (Payne, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 15-05014 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 6859553, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]