New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert B Kugler
Referred: Joel Schneider
Case #: 1:15-cv-04055
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2015
Terminated:May 26, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Dec 12, 2015 7:55 AM EST
Defendant
EMSL ANALYTICAL, INC.
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Schwartz Simon Edelstein & Celso LLC
contact info
Defendant
MARYBETH DEMALO
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Schwartz Simon Edelstein & Celso LLC
contact info
Defendant
BONNIE FIORENTINO
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Schwartz Simon Edelstein & Celso LLC
contact info
Defendant
LUC BOISCLAIR
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Schwartz Simon Edelstein & Celso LLC
contact info
Defendant
FLORENCE PETERSON
Represented By
STEFANI C. SCHWARTZ
Schwartz Simon Edelstein & Celso LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD ROBOLD
Represented By
KURT DAVID RAATZS
Swartz Swidler, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES #1-25
Terminated: 10/23/2015


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 26, 2016
60 60 misc Letter: Remand Thu 05/26 2:16 PM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Burlington County Courthouse 49 Rancocas Road Mount Holly, NJ 08060 State No: BUR L 527 15. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (js)
Related: [-]
59 59 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/26 2:15 PM
ORDER, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3) the Court DECLINES to exercise supplemental jurisdiction; and IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the matter is REMANDED to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Burlington County, Law Division for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; Case Closed. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/26/16. (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2016
58 58 misc Letter Wed 05/25 5:52 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel re57 Order to Show Cause,. (MILLER, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
57 57 order Order to Show Cause Fri 05/20 12:11 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDERED that Pltf is required to SHOW CAUSE in writing within 7 days of the date of this Order why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Pltf's state law claims and remand the case to the New Jersey Superior Court, Law Division, Burlington County, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/20/2016. (dmr)
Related: [-]