Member Case
Lead case is: 2:11-bk-19292

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eric L Frank
Case #: 2:11-bk-19294
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2011
Dismissed:Feb 09, 2015
Terminated:Feb 26, 2015

Debtor
Shore Bare Feet Shoes, Inc.
121 N Michigan Ave
Atlantic City, NJ 08401-4138
Represented By
ALLEN B. DUBROFF
contact info
Debtor
Shore Bare Feet Shoes, Inc
MAILING ADDRESS Cedar Brook Plaza 1000 Easton Road, Suite 105
Wyncote, PA 19095
Represented By
ALLEN B. DUBROFF
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 833 Chestnut Street Suite 500
Philadelphia, PA 19107
Represented By
DAVE P. ADAMS
United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/10/2013 6:35 PM EST
Tuesday, December 06, 2011
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-19294 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11163293. Fee Amount $1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1046 Filed by SHORE BARE FEET SHOES, INC.. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 06/3/2012. Matrix List of Creditors due 12/13/2011. Matrix List of Creditors due 12/13/2011. Atty Disclosure Statement due 12/20/2011. Schedule A due 12/20/2011. Schedule B due 12/20/2011. Schedule C due 12/20/2011. Schedule D due 12/20/2011. Schedule E due 12/20/2011. Schedule F due 12/20/2011. Schedule G due 12/20/2011. Schedule H due 12/20/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/20/2011. Summary of schedules due 12/20/2011. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 12/20/2011. Equity Security Holders due 12/20/2011. Incomplete Filings due 12/20/2011. (DUBROFF, ALLEN)***See Corrective Entry dated 12/7/2011*** Modified on 12/7/2011 (G., Jennifer).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 RESOLUTION
Att: 2 STATEMENT OF CORPORATE OWNERSHIP
2 2 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by DAVE P. ADAMS Filed by DAVE P. ADAMS on behalf of United States Trustee. (ADAMS, DAVE)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Resolution Filed by ALLEN B. DUBROFF on behalf of Shore Bare Feet Shoes, Inc . (G., Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by ALLEN B. DUBROFF on behalf of Shore Bare Feet Shoes, Inc . (G., Jennifer)
Related: [-]