UTOMO v. KOMEGASHI RESTAURANT GROUP INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy L Waldor |
Referred: | Cathy L Waldor |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-04104 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 14, 2015 7:15 AM EST |
Defendant
KOMEGASHI RESTAURANT GROUP INC.
|
|
Defendant
JOHNNY LEUNG
|
|
Plaintiff
WILLY UTOMO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/15 11:58 AM
STIPULATION/ORDER OF DISMISSAL between parties, w/out prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/15/16. (DD, ) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 07/15 11:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 7/15/2016. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, ) |
||
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Thu 07/14 2:25 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on Friday, July 15, 2016 at 10:30 AM.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/14/16. (tjg, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/29 11:28 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by KOMEGASHI RESTAURANT GROUP INC., JOHNNY LEUNG, WILLY UTOMO. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (DD, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Wed 06/22 12:20 PM
Letter from Robert Kraselnik.(KRASELNIK, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction | ||
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 06/15 1:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Settlement Conference held on 6/15/2016. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, ) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Wed 06/01 11:08 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an in-person settlement conference in Courtroom 4C on Wednesday, June 15, 2016 at 11:00 AM. Trial counsel and persons with full settlement authority must be present, and the parties shall submit confidential settlement memoranda to the Court, via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov, in advance of the settlement conference. The motion (ECF No. 15) is adjourned pending the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/1/16. (tjg, ) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Fri 05/27 12:41 PM
Letter from Robert Lewis, Esq.. (GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
Monday, May 02, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Set/Reset Hearing on Motion
Mon 05/02 11:34 AM
ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants : Motion reset for 6/2/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler.. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 5/2/16. (DD, ) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Mon 05/02 11:06 AM
Letter from Robert L. Kraselnik. (KRASELNIK, ROBERT) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/02 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT LOUIS KRASELNIK on behalf of KOMEGASHI RESTAURANT GROUP INC., JOHNNY LEUNG (KRASELNIK, ROBERT) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/28 9:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants . Motion set for 5/2/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) |
||
Saturday, March 26, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment
Sat 03/26 12:59 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants by WILLY UTOMO. Responses due by 3/30/2016(GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Robert Y. Lewis, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Willy Utomo, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Wed 03/23 5:31 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT LEWIS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, ) |
||
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Tue 03/22 10:37 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert Y. Lewis to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/22 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY SULLIVAN GOETT on behalf of WILLY UTOMO (GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fee Received
Fri 03/04 3:44 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee as to ROBERT Y. LEWIS, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW028863 (DD, ) |
||
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 02/16 9:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Y. Lewis . Motion set for 3/21/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) |
||
Monday, February 15, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/16 11:44 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ROBERT Y. LEWIS, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/15/16. (DD, ) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Fri 02/12 3:46 PM
Exhibit to10 Motion for Leave to Appear by WILLY UTOMO. (GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/12 3:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Y. Lewis by WILLY UTOMO.(GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration App / Declaration of Local Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Applicant, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 10/19 3:34 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to deft., Komegashi Restaurant Group Inc. ("Komegashi") and Johnny Leung ("Leung") for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (DD, ) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Request for Default
Thu 10/15 3:52 PM
Request for Default by WILLY UTOMO against Defendants Komegashi Restaurant Group, Inc. and Johnny Leung.(GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 10/15 12:11 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by WILLY UTOMO.(GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/15 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY SULLIVAN GOETT on behalf of WILLY UTOMO (GOETT, GREGORY) |
|
utility
Remark (public)
Thu 10/15 1:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTE RE: de#7(Motion for Entry of Default) - Counsel filed document using incorrect event, will refile. (sr, ) |
||
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/31 12:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLY UTOMO. JOHNNY LEUNG served on 7/28/2015, answer due 8/18/2015. (BARRETT, LEVI) |
|
Monday, August 03, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/03 7:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WILLY UTOMO. KOMEGASHI RESTAURANT GROUP INC. served on 7/6/2015, answer due 7/27/2015. (BARRETT, LEVI) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Mon 08/03 10:29 AM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ALEXANDER TODD LINZER terminated. Attorney LEVI WINSTON BARRETT for WILLY UTOMO added.. (BARRETT, LEVI) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/17 2:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to KOMEGASHI RESTAURANT GROUP INC., JOHNNY LEUNG Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JACKELINE BARCO* (JB, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/17 2:08 PM
COMPLAINT against KOMEGASHI RESTAURANT GROUP INC., JOHNNY LEUNG ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6458859) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WILLY UTOMO.(JB, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
qc
QC - Updating Account
Wed 06/17 2:11 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Alexander Linzer on June 17, 2015 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (JB, ) |