Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08120
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2015
Terminated:Feb 04, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sunlink Corporation, a Delaware corporation
1010 B Street, Suite 400
SAn Rafael, CA 94901
Represented By
Sunlink Corporation
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Saturday, February 06, 2016
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Sat 02/06 10:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case. Notice Date 02/06/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2016
18 18 misc Returned Mail Fri 02/05 2:10 PM
Returned mail received for John Does 1 - 10. ***NO PDF ATTACHED*** Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 17 Order Dismissing Case
Thursday, February 04, 2016
17 17 order Dismissing Case Thu 02/04 2:06 PM
Order Dismissing Case Signed on 2/4/2016. (drh)
Related: [-]
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Thu 02/04 2:17 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8120 Judgment For N/A; Case Settled, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8120 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2016
16 16 motion Stipulation Tue 01/26 4:20 PM
Stipulation Between R. Sam Hopkins and Sunlink Corporation Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
15 15 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:49 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2015
14 14 order Withdrawal of Reference Thu 10/15 5:19 PM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+] . The Motion is GRANTED to the extent defendant seeks a withdrawal when the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial. The Motion is DENIED to the extent defendant seeks an immediate withdrawal. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill on 10/7/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, September 10, 2015
13 13 notice Notice Thu 09/10 6:54 PM
The District Court misc file has closed; A civil case has been opened: 4:15-cv-00409-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by Dana R Hoyle, Deputy Clerk. (drh)
Related: [-] 12 Notice 12 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08210-BLW. No PDF Attached (related documents9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) Filed by (RE: related document(s)9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Sunlink Corporation). (drh)
Friday, August 07, 2015
12 12 notice Notice Fri 08/07 1:45 PM
Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08210-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Sunlink Corporation
11 11 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 08/07 9:33 AM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-08120 JDP) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5602930. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#9
10 10 misc Support Brief/Memorandum Fri 08/07 9:32 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Filed by Defendant Sunlink Corporation Related [+]. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176
9 9 motion Withdrawal of Reference Fri 08/07 9:32 AM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Sunlink Corporation (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/07 8:39 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Sunlink Corporation (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
7 7 misc Consent Wed 08/05 1:34 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
6 6 order Order (Generic) Tue 08/04 11:30 AM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 8/4/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/03 10:53 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jed W Manwaring Filed by Defendant Sunlink Corporation. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 06/24 11:57 AM
Summons Service Executed on Sunlink Corporation 6/23/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/23 2:41 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08120 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5543712. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 22, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/22 10:15 AM
Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/22/2015, Answer Due 7/22/2015; Sunlink Corporation Date Issued 6/22/2015, Answer Due 7/22/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/19 4:14 PM
Adversary case 15-08120 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Sunlink Corporation, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons