Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08125
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2015
Terminated:Oct 09, 2015
Last checked: never
Defendant
Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., a Wisconsin corporation, a division of Clean Harbors, Inc., a Massachusetts corporation
5400 Legacy Drive
Plano, TX 75024
Represented By
Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, October 09, 2015
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Fri 10/09 1:55 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8125 Judgment For N/A; Case Settled, - Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8125 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2015
7 7 notice Notice Wed 10/07 1:28 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
6 6 answer Response Wed 09/23 2:30 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) 5 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP)
Thursday, September 10, 2015
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 09/10 6:39 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: There is a pending compromise (docket 480 in the main case). Objection period runds through 10/5/15. No action will be taken to dismiss this case. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP)
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
5 5 court Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) Wed 09/02 8:39 AM
Notice of Conditional Dismissal UPON EXAMINATION of the record herein, the Court finds that cause exists to believe that the parties are NOT diligently prosecuting this adversary case. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that pursuant to Local Rule 7041.1 relating to dismissal in inactive cases, the above entitled case will be DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION unless a party takes further action in accordance with Local Rule 7041.1(a). Elizabeth A. Smith, Clerk of Court This is the Official Notice from the Court. No Document is attached Adversary Action due by 9/23/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 06/24 12:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. 6/23/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/23 2:41 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08125 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5543712. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 22, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/22 1:14 PM
Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/22/2015, Answer Due 7/22/2015; Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. Date Issued 6/22/2015, Answer Due 7/22/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/19 4:50 PM
Adversary case 15-08125 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons