Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08130
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2015
Terminated:Feb 26, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc., an Ohio corporation
1600 Enterprise Parkway
Twinsburg, OH 44087
Represented By
Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, February 29, 2016
17 17 misc Returned Mail Mon 02/29 10:00 AM
Returned mail received for Undeliverable Address: John Does 1 - 10 - ***NO PDF ATTACHED*** Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Stipulation
Sunday, February 28, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order Sun 02/28 10:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order Notice Date 02/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2016
15 15 order Stipulated Order Fri 02/26 10:13 AM
Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Related [+] Signed on 2/26/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 14
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Fri 02/26 1:13 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8130 Judgment For N/A - Case Settled, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8130 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2016
14 14 motion Stipulation Thu 02/25 4:51 PM
Stipulation Between R. Sam Hopkins and Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
13 13 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:04 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2015
12 12 utility Substitution of Attorney Mon 10/12 10:31 AM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Daniel C Green Terminated Filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.. (Olsen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2015
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Fri 08/14 4:03 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Please disregard dockets9 and10 ; correct Consent filed as docket11 . No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 9 Consent filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.,10 Consent filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.
Thursday, August 13, 2015
11 11 misc Consent Thu 08/13 8:31 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent Thu 08/13 8:25 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
utility Corrective Entry Wed 08/12 3:01 PM
Corrective Action: Counsel has indicated representation for the Plaintiff rather than the Defendant on the PDF. Please correct and re-file. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 8/17/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 9 Consent filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
9 9 misc Consent Tue 08/11 11:50 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Mon 08/03 1:57 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
7 7 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/30 11:12 AM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 07/29 12:19 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.. Filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc.. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/22 1:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 06/24 12:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc. 6/23/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/23 2:41 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08130 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5543712. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 22, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/22 3:42 PM
Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/22/2015, Answer Due 7/22/2015; Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc. Date Issued 6/22/2015, Answer Due 7/22/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/19 5:42 PM
Adversary case 15-08130 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Pepperl + Fuchs, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons