Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08136
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2015
Terminated:Jan 09, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc., a California corporation
25212 Marguerite Parkway, Suite 200
Mission Viejo, CA 92692
Represented By
Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, January 09, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Mon 01/09 10:00 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8136 Judgment For Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8136 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
22 22 order Stipulated Order Thu 01/05 11:57 AM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/5/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, December 29, 2016
21 21 motion Stipulation Thu 12/29 3:17 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
20 20 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 9:59 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
19 19 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 2:07 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number17 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 17 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 10:48 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 9:27 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 9:27 AM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
16 16 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:28 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2015
15 15 order Withdrawal of Reference Thu 10/15 4:26 PM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+] . The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and dispositive motions. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill 10/7/2015. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (drh)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, September 10, 2015
14 14 notice Notice Thu 09/10 6:52 PM
The District Court misc file has closed; A civil case has been opened: 4:15-cv-00408-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by Dana R Hoyle, Deputy Clerk. (drh)
Related: [-] 12 Notice 12 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08200-BLW. No PDF Attached (related documents9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) Filed by (RE: related document(s)9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc.). (drh)
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
13 13 misc Statement of Compliance Tue 08/25 10:36 AM
Statement of Compliance Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Thursday, August 06, 2015
12 12 notice Notice Thu 08/06 12:09 PM
Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08200-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc.
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
11 11 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 08/05 7:10 PM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-08136 JDP) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5600710. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#9
10 10 misc Support Brief/Memorandum Wed 08/05 6:50 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Filed by Defendant Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc. Related [+]. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176
9 9 motion Withdrawal of Reference Wed 08/05 6:49 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Mon 08/03 2:01 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
7 7 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/30 11:15 AM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/22 8:57 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/30 1:45 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jed W Manwaring Filed by Defendant Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc.. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 06/24 12:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc. 6/24/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/23 2:41 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08136 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5543712. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 22, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/22 4:11 PM
Summons Issued on Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc. Date Issued 6/22/2015, Answer Due 7/22/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/22/2015, Answer Due 7/22/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/19 7:04 PM
Adversary case 15-08136 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Design Space Modular Buildings, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons