California Southern District Court
Judge:William Q Hayes
Referred: David H Bartick
Case #: 3:15-cv-01358
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2015
Terminated:Jul 30, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Dec 19, 2015 6:22 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
Defendant
S&L Specialty Contracting, Inc.
Represented By
Laura B. MacNeel
Finch, Thornton & Baird, LLP
contact info
Chad T. Wishchuk
Finch, Thornton & Baird, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trace Morris
Represented By
Eric Maxwell Overholt
Hiden Rott And Oertle
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 30, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 07/30 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Trace Morris(Overholt, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, June 25, 2015
4 4 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 06/25 2:43 PM
ORDER Granting3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. S&L Specialty Contracting, Inc.'s response to the Complaint is now due on 7/29/2015. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/25/2015. (rlu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 06/24 11:45 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading To Complaint by S&L Specialty Contracting, Inc..(MacNeel, Laura)Attorney Laura B. MacNeel added to party S&L Specialty Contracting, Inc. (pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Order
Monday, June 22, 2015
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Mon 06/22 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by S&L Specialty Contracting, Inc. (MacNeel, Laura)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 06/22 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court, San Diego, County, Central Division, case number 37-2015 00013069-CU-OE-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-8179957.), filed by S&L Specialty Contracting, Inc.. The new case number is 3:15-cv-1358-WQH-DHB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick are assigned to the case. (Wishchuk, Chad)(fth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D,
Att: 3 Declaration of James Leana,
Att: 4 Proof of Service