Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 4:10-cv-00020
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2010
Terminated:Feb 03, 2010
Defendant
Argus Health Systems, Inc.
Defendant
DST Systems Inc
Plaintiff
Omnicare, Inc.

GPO Feb 03 2010
ORDER and OPINION remanding case to state court. Signed on 02/03/2010 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Will-Fees, Eva) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2010: # (1) Exhibit Remand Letter) (Kee, Georgia).


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.