Local Corporation, a Delaware corporation
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Scott C Clarkson |
Case #: | 8:15-bk-13153 |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 30, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 30, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Local Corporation, a Delaware corporation
7555 Irvine Center Drive
Irvine, CA 92618 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 24, 2015 2:42 PM PDT |
Creditor
Fast Pay Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Creditors Committee
Robins Kaplan LLP 2049 Century Park East Suite 3400
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Interested Party
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Represented By
|