New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:15-cv-04859
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause20:1681 Title IX Educational Amendments 1992 - Sex Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2015
Terminated:Jan 17, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Dec 20, 2015 6:38 AM EST
Defendant
Dean George Ranalli
Represented By
Andrew G. Celli
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP
contact info
Alison Ellis Frick
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP
contact info
Defendant
George Ranalli
Defendant
The City University of New York
Represented By
Alissa Schecter Wright
Attorney General Of The State Of New York
contact info
Plaintiff
Ariella Campisi
Represented By
Casimir Joseph Wolnowski
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
62 62 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 9:31 AM
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT, GENERAL RELEASE & ORDER OF DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, in consideration of the mutual promises, covenants, representations, and other consideration contained in this Stipulation, Plaintiff and Defendants hereby stipulate and agree, and the Court orders, as follows: 1. The Action and all claims asserted therein against CUNY or against Defendant Ranalli-or which could have been asserted therein against CUNY or against Defendant Ranalli, based on allegations made in the Complaint or otherwise-are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and without payments, attorneys' fees, costs, disbursements, or expenses in excess of the amounts specified in Paragraph 2(a) of this Stipulation. 2. For and in consideration of Plaintiff's execution of this Stipulation, her agreement to be bound by its terms, and her undertakings as set forth herein including, but not limited to, the dismissal of the Action with prejudice and other good and valuable consideration, the sufficiency of which is hereby acknowledged, and subject to any reservation for payment to Medicare as set forth in Paragraphs 7 and 8, the State of New York, on behalf of CUNY, shall pay the total sum of Eighty Thousand Dollars and No Cents ($80,000.00) in full and complete satisfaction of all claims, allegations, or actions, direct or indirect, known or unknown, that Plaintiff had, has, or may have against CUNY and/or The City College of the City University of New York ("CCNY") (including, but not limited to, any of CUNY's and/or CCNY's officials, employees, or agents, whether in their individual or official capacities, and any and all agencies, departments, and subdivisions of the State of New York), and/or against Defendant Ranalli, arising out of any conduct, acts or omissions prior to, and as of the date of this Stipulation, including but not limited to those asserted in the Action; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/17/2017) (mro)
Related: [-]
61 61 misc Letter Tue 4:51 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from David B. Diamond dated January 17, 2017 re: Parties' Submission of a Stipulation of Settement to the Court's Orders and Judgments Clerk. Document filed by The City University of New York.(Diamond, David)
Related: [-]