New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine B Forrest
Case #: 1:15-cv-04935
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Jun 01, 2016
Last checked: Monday Dec 21, 2015 9:17 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Concepts in Staffing, Inc.
Represented By
Bernard H. Vogel
Vogel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Concepts in Staffing, Inc.
Represented By
Bernard H. Vogel
Vogel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Mona Abrams
Counter Defendant
Arthur Abrams
Defendant
Arthur Abrams
Defendant
Mona Abrams
Defendant
Concepts in Staffing, Inc.
Represented By
Bernard H. Vogel
Vogel & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MONA ABRAMS
Plaintiff
Matthew Belardinelli
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Jason B. Klimpl
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Spector
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Jason B. Klimpl
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charese McNeill
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Jason B. Klimpl
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Leslie Linsner
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Jason B. Klimpl
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arthur Krakowski
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Jason B. Klimpl
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Berwald Gaspari
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Jason B. Klimpl
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeanine Fenton
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Jason B. Klimpl
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Norman Dymbort
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Jason B. Klimpl
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW BELARDINELLI
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AMY BERWALD GASPARI
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
NORMAN DYMBORT
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JEANINE FENTON
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN SPECTOR
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARESE MCNEILL
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LESLIE LINSNER
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ARTHUR KRAKOWSKI
Represented By
Joel A. Klarreich
Tannenbaum Helpern Syracuse & Hirschtritt LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, August 10, 2016
37 37 order Order on Motion for Conference Wed 08/10 11:07 AM
ORDER denying35 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court is in receipt of plaintiffs' August 3, 2016 letter motion requesting a conference to facilitate implementation of the parties' settlement agreement approved by this Court on June 1, 2016 (ECF No. 35), as well as defendants' August 3, 2016 response (ECF No. 36). The Court does not have jurisdiction to enforce the settlement. "Such motions are essentially state-law contract claims to be litigated in the state courts." In re Am. Exp. Financial Advisors Secs. Litig., 672 F.3d 113, 134 (2d Cir. 2011). A federal court retains jurisdiction over a settlement that precedes a case's dismissal only "if the parties' obligation to comply with the terms of the settlement agreement had been made part of the order of dismissaleither by separate provision (such as a provision 'retaining jurisdiction' over the settlement agreement) or by incorporating the terms of the settlement agreement in the order." Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co. of Am., 511 U.S. 375, 381 (1994). "The judge's mere awareness and approval of the terms of the settlement agreement do not suffice to make them part of [her] order." Id. The Court has reviewed the June 1, 2016 order approving the proposed settlement as fair and reasonable. (ECF No. 34.) That order did not explicitly retain jurisdiction over the settlement or incorporate the terms of the settlement such that a failure to comply with the settlement amounted to a violation of the order. The Court therefore does not have jurisdiction to provide plaintiffs with the relief they request, and plaintiffs' letter motion is accordingly denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 35. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/10/2016) (mro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
36 36 misc Letter Wed 08/03 3:59 PM
COUNTER LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from David C. Nevins, Esq. dated August 3, 2016 re: settlement. Document filed by Arthur Abrams.(Vogel, Bernard)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Conference Wed 08/03 1:16 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:34 Order of Dismissal, addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jason B. Klimpl dated August 3, 2016. Document filed by Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Jeanine Fenton, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector.(Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
34 34 order Order of Dismissal Wed 06/01 12:27 PM
ORDER: Based on the foregoing, the Court has carefully reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. See Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). Accordingly, the settlement is APPROVED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/1/2016) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2016
33 33 misc Letter Fri 05/27 1:16 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jason B. Klimpl dated May 27, 2016 re: Detailed Hourly Breakdown. Document filed by Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Jeanine Fenton, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector.(Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A(Detailed timekeepers hourly rates, and time entries),
Att: 2 Exhibit B(J. Klimpl's Attorney Bio)
Monday, May 23, 2016
32 32 order Memo Endorsement Mon 05/23 5:49 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:30 Letter, filed by Amy Berwald Gaspari, Norman Dymbort, Arthur Krakowski, Jeanine Fenton, Leslie Linsner, Steven Spector, Charese McNeill, Matthew Belardinelli. ENDORSEMENT: The Court needs to see the detailed hourly breakdown for the fee request. Plaintiffs shall submit such breakdown by 5/27 along with the hourly rates of any time keepers. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/23/2016) (lmb)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Settlement Agreement Mon 05/23 1:50 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT with Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal and Affidavit in Support . Document filed by Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Jeanine Fenton, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector.(Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Letter Mon 05/23 1:25 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jason B. Klimpl dated May 23, 2016 re: Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Jeanine Fenton, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector.(Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
29 29 order Memo Endorsement Tue 05/17 11:33 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:28 Letter filed by Arthur Abrams. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/16/2016) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
28 28 misc Letter Fri 05/13 1:57 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bernard Vogel, Esq. dated 5/13/16 re: adjournment. Document filed by Arthur Abrams.(Vogel, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
27 27 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Fri 04/15 8:25 AM
ORDER: On April 14, 2016, the parties informed the Court that they reached a settlement in principle. In light of that representation, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The parties shall, not later than Monday, May 16, 2016, submit any materials in support of the fairness of their settlement, including at least: a. An executed copy of the proposed settlement; and b. A breakdown of what portion of that settlement will go toward attorneys fees and the basis for those fees. 2. All other dates and deadlines are adjourned. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/15/2016) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
26 26 misc Letter Thu 04/14 6:01 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Jason B. Klimpl dated April 14, 2016 re: Status update. Document filed by Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Jeanine Fenton, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector.(Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2016
25 25 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 03/14 9:27 AM
ORDER: The telephonic status conference scheduled for April 15, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby ADJOURNED. Instead of the conference, the parties shall provide the Court with a short status letter setting out the progress in this matter not later than Friday, April 15, 2016. The status letter should update the Court as to the status of any discovery in this case and any settlement discussions. The parties may file a single joint letter or separate status letters. Any party may move for a telephonic conference. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/14/2016) (mro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2015
24 24 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 12/09 2:45 PM
ORDER. As set forth during the telephonic status conference held on December 9, 2015, the next telephonic status conference is set for April 15, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall call (212) 805-0139 on a single line at the time of the conference. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/15/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/9/2015) (adc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2015
23 23 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/01 5:58 PM
ORDER: The telephonic status conference set for December 4, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby rescheduled to Wednesday, December 9, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall call (212) 805-0139 on a single line at the time of the conference., ( Telephone Conference set for 12/9/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/1/2015) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2015
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 10/08 11:04 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 10/8/2015. Settlement conference scheduled for March 21, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (bh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2015
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 10/05 6:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 10/5/2015. A follow up telephone conference is scheduled for October 8, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. (bh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2015
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 09/18 9:08 AM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Concepts in Staffing, Inc..(Vogel, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
21 21 order Order Wed 09/16 4:04 PM
ORDER: The Court observes that defendants' response to plaintiffs' amended complaint (ECF No. 16) was due on September 14, 2015. The Court assumes that defendants do not intend to default in this proceeding. Defendant shall file a response to the amended complaint as soon as possible. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/16/2015) (kl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/10 8:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Trial will be before a jury. Only Plaintiffs request trial by jury. Trial in this matter shall commence on 7/25/16. Trial is anticipated to take 1 week. Motions due by 5/27/2016. Responses due by 6/17/2016. Replies due by 6/24/2016. Fact Discovery due by 5/2/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2016 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/4/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2016. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/9/2015) (lmb)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/10 8:40 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/9/2015) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
18 18 misc Pre-Conference Statement Tue 09/08 3:51 PM
PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT re: Proposed Scheduling Order . Document filed by Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Jeanine Fenton, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector.(Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
17 17 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 08/21 1:22 PM
ANSWER to15 Counterclaim. Document filed by Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Jeanine Fenton, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector.(Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/21 1:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Arthur Abrams, Mona Abrams, Concepts in Staffing, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Norman Dymbort, Matthew Belardinelli, Jeanine Fenton, Arthur Krakowski, Steven Spector, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Charese McNeill, Leslie Linsner. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Amy Berwald Gaspari, Norman Dymbort, Arthur Krakowski, Jeanine Fenton, Leslie Linsner, Steven Spector, Charese McNeill, Matthew Belardinelli.(Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 07/31 1:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Concepts in Staffing, Inc..(Vogel, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2015
14 14 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/27 6:19 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Amy Berwald Gaspari, Norman Dymbort, Arthur Krakowski, Jeanine Fenton, Leslie Linsner, Steven Spector, Charese McNeill, Matthew Belardinelli. ENDORSEMENT: Conference rescheduled to 9/9/15 at 5pm, in person., Motions terminated:12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bernard H. Vogel dated July 22, 2015.FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bernard H. Vogel dated July 22, 2015. filed by Concepts in Staffing, Inc., ( Initial Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 05:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/27/2015) (lmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2015
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/23 4:00 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from JASON B. KLIMPL dated 07/23/2015 re:12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bernard H. Vogel dated July 22, 2015.FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bernard H. Vogel dated July 22, 2015. . Document filed by Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Jeanine Fenton, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector. (Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Adjourn Conference Thu 07/23 10:07 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bernard H. Vogel dated July 22, 2015., FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Bernard H. Vogel dated July 22, 2015.( Return Date set for 7/28/2015 at 02:00 PM.) Document filed by Concepts in Staffing, Inc..(Vogel, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2015
11 11 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Mon 07/13 2:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Concepts in Staffing, Inc. served on 7/6/2015, answer due 7/27/2015. Service was accepted by NANCY DOUGHERTY, an agent of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Document filed by Norman Dymbort; Matthew Belardinelli; Jeanine Fenton; Arthur Krakowski; Steven Spector; Amy Berwald Gaspari; Charese McNeill; Leslie Linsner. (Klimpl, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
10 10 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 06/29 4:18 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/28/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/29/2015) (kgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2015
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 06/25 4:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arthur Abrams. (rch)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 06/25 4:44 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Concepts in Staffing, Inc.. (rch)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 06/25 4:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mona Abrams. (rch)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 06/25 4:34 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joel A. Klarreich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Matthew Belardinelli, Norman Dymbort, Amy Berwald Gaspari, Jeanine Fenton, Arthur Krakowski, Leslie Linsner, Charese McNeill, Steven Spector, Mona Abrams. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (rch)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 06/25 4:48 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 06/25 4:48 PM
Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (rch)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 06/25 4:48 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/24 6:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arthur Abrams, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by MATTHEW BELARDINELLI, NORMAN DYMBORT, JEANINE FENTON, AMY BERWALD GASPARI, ARTHUR KRAKOWSKI, LESLIE LINSNER, CHARESE MCNEILL, STEVEN SPECTOR. (Klarreich, Joel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/24 6:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mona Abrams, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by MATTHEW BELARDINELLI, NORMAN DYMBORT, JEANINE FENTON, AMY BERWALD GASPARI, ARTHUR KRAKOWSKI, LESLIE LINSNER, CHARESE MCNEILL, STEVEN SPECTOR. (Klarreich, Joel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/24 6:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Concepts in Staffing, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by MATTHEW BELARDINELLI, NORMAN DYMBORT, JEANINE FENTON, AMY BERWALD GASPARI, ARTHUR KRAKOWSKI, LESLIE LINSNER, CHARESE MCNEILL, STEVEN SPECTOR. (Klarreich, Joel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 06/24 4:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Klarreich, Joel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/24 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11075339)Document filed by LESLIE LINSNER, AMY BERWALD GASPARI, CHARESE MCNEILL, NORMAN DYMBORT, STEVEN SPECTOR, MATTHEW BELARDINELLI, JEANINE FENTON, ARTHUR KRAKOWSKI.(Klarreich, Joel)
Related: [-]