New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Referred: Judith C Mccarthy
Case #: 7:15-cv-04933
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Aug 29, 2017
Last checked: Monday Dec 21, 2015 8:11 AM EST
All Defendants
DANIEL P DUTHIE
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
All Defendants
Beth Finkelstein
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
All Defendants
MICHAEL L KLEIN
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
All Defendants
MONA MONTAL
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
All Defendants
Michael Reilly
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 RAMAPO 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
All Defendants
CHRISTOPHER P SAINT LAWRENCE
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
All Defendants
Town Of Ramapo
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
Represented By
Rebecca Grace Baldwin Mantello
Tarshis, Catania, Liberth, Mahon & Milligram
contact info
All Defendants
BRENDEL CHARLES
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
All Plaintiffs
RESOLUTION CONSULTING GROUP, INC. d/b/a RESOLUTION ENERGY GROUP
520 WHITE PLAINS ROUTE, SUITE 500
TARRYTOWN, NY 10591
All Plaintiffs
Christopher J. Schiller
Represented By
Rebecca Grace Baldwin Mantello
Tarshis, Catania, Liberth, Mahon & Milligram
contact info
Defendant
Melissa A. Cobuzzi
Defendant
Yitzchok Ullman
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
EnergyNext, Inc.
Defendant
Jeffrey S. Hills
Defendant
Integrys Energy Services of New York, Inc.
Defendant
M & R Energy Resource Corp.
Defendant
Municipal Electric and Gas Alliance, Incorporated
Defendant
Patrick O'Gara
Defendant
Nathan Oberman
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jody Spaeth
Defendant
Town of Ramapo Town Board
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gordon Boyd
Defendant
Stephen Wemple
Defendant
Town Of Ramapo
TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Withers
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Reilly
Individually TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 RAMAPO 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mona Montal
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael L. Klein
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Beth Finkelstein
Individually TOWN OF RAMAPO 237 ROUTE 59
SUFFERN, NY 10901
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Daniel P. Duthie
Represented By
Joseph J. Ranni
Ranni Law Firm
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christopher P. St. Lawrence
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brendel Charles
Represented By
Brian S. Sokoloff
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Kevin Levine
Sokoloff Stern LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher J. Schiller
Represented By
Richard Martin Mahon
Tarshis, Catania, Liberth, Mahon & Milligram
contact info
Rebecca Grace Baldwin Mantello
Tarshis, Catania, Liberth, Mahon & Milligram
contact info
Richard Stephen Pakola
Town Of Orangeburg Town Hall
contact info
Kevin Thomas Mulhearn
Kevin T. Mulhearn, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Resolution Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By
Richard Martin Mahon
Tarshis, Catania, Liberth, Mahon & Milligram
contact info
Rebecca Grace Baldwin Mantello
Tarshis, Catania, Liberth, Mahon & Milligram
contact info
Richard Stephen Pakola
Town Of Orangeburg Town Hall
contact info
Kevin Thomas Mulhearn
Kevin T. Mulhearn, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 22, 2018
251 251 misc Transcript Thu 02/22 12:15 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 9/23/2016 before Judge Cathy Seibel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Arends-Dieck, (914) 390-4103. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2018.(Arends-Dieck, Christina)
Related: [-]
250 250 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Thu 02/22 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 9/23/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Arends-Dieck, Christina)
Related: [-]