Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:John R Adams
Case #: 5:15-cv-01270
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Mar 14, 2017
Last checked: Monday Dec 21, 2015 6:13 AM EST
Defendant
Summit County Educational Service Center
Represented By
Matthew John Markling
Mcgown & Markling
contact info
Patrick S. Vrobel
Mcgown & Markling
contact info
Defendant
Summit County Educational Service Center Governing Board
420 Washington Ave.
Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44221
Represented By
Matthew John Markling
Mcgown & Markling
contact info
Patrick S. Vrobel
Mcgown & Markling
contact info
Plaintiff
Devin Gardner
Represented By
Beverly J. Farlow
Farlow & Associates
contact info

GPO Mar 14 2017
Order and Decision granting Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. #38). Defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied as moot (Doc. #22). Judge John R. Adams on 3/14/17. (K,C)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 28, 2017
52 52 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 04/28 11:44 AM
True copy of order from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Appeal dismissed upon consideration of the Motion for Voluntary Dismissal re51 (USCA# 17-3376 . Date issued by USCA 4/27/17 (H,SP)
Related: [-]