Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08137
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Apr 04, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dynamic Engineering, Inc., a Michigan corporation
215 Broadus Street, Suite 100
Sturgis, MI 49091
Represented By
Dynamic Engineering, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 04/04 1:11 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8137 Judgment For N/A - Case Dismissed by Plaintiff, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8137 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
16 16 motion Notice of Dismissal Mon 04/03 5:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
15 15 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 10:00 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, November 21, 2016
14 14 misc Statement of No Objection Mon 11/21 11:08 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number11 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 11 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 11/02 10:28 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk edited the objection deadline to November 18, 2016, based on the amended Certificate of Service filed [14 days + 3 for mailing]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon,13 Amended Certificate of Service filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
13 13 misc Amended Certificate of Service Tue 11/01 8:59 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 11 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 10:59 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 9:37 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 9:36 AM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Fri 07/15 2:20 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: The Court has reviewed the Status Report and is satisfied with the information provided. The adversary proceeding may remain pending. Counsel to please submit similar reports in the future. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 10 Status Report filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins
Tuesday, July 12, 2016
10 10 trustee Status Report Tue 07/12 3:54 PM
Status Report Notice to Court Re: Status of Dynamic Engineering, Inc., Bankruptcy Adversary Case Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2015
9 9 notice Notice Wed 12/30 12:32 PM
Notice of Activity in Defendant's Texas Bankruptcy Case Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2015
8 8 order Retain Thu 10/01 11:35 AM
Order Granting Motion to Retain (to November 30, 2015) Related [+] Signed on 10/1/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, September 29, 2015
7 7 motion Retain Tue 09/29 9:40 AM
Motion to Retain Case on Active Status Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
6 6 answer Response Wed 09/23 2:25 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) 5 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP)
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
5 5 court Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) Wed 09/02 8:41 AM
Notice of Conditional Dismissal UPON EXAMINATION of the record herein, the Court finds that cause exists to believe that the parties are NOT diligently prosecuting this adversary case. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that pursuant to Local Rule 7041.1 relating to dismissal in inactive cases, the above entitled case will be DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION unless a party takes further action in accordance with Local Rule 7041.1(a). Elizabeth A. Smith, Clerk of Court This is the Official Notice from the Court. No Document is attached Adversary Action due by 9/23/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
4 4 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08137 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/26 2:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dynamic Engineering, Inc. 6/26/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 06/25 5:09 PM
Summons Issued on Dynamic Engineering, Inc. Date Issued 6/25/2015, Answer Due 7/27/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/25/2015, Answer Due 7/27/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/24 3:21 PM
Adversary case 15-08137 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Dynamic Engineering, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons