Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08143
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Jan 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Flowserve US, Inc., a/k/a Flowserve Pump Division
11818 Bay Hurst Drive
Houston, TX 77024
Represented By
Flowserve US, Inc., a/k/a Flowserve Pump Division
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 05, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Thu 01/05 5:35 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8143 Judgment For N/A - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8143 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
23 23 order Stipulated Order Tue 01/03 4:07 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/3/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 22
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
22 22 motion Stipulation Tue 12/27 9:11 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
21 21 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 10:05 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
20 20 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 2:14 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number18 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 18 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:06 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 10:48 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 10:47 AM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
17 17 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:35 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
16 16 court Court's Certificate of Service Fri 08/28 3:04 PM
Court's Certificate of Service re6 Order (Generic), 14 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application, 15 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Andrew Edson, Esq. and Robert P. Franke, Esq. Strasburger & Price, LLP 901 Main St, Ste 4400 Dallas, TX 75202 Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic), 14 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc., 15 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc.
15 15 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 08/28 3:01 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Robert P. Franke by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/28/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 11
14 14 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 08/28 2:58 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Andrew G. Edson by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/28/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, August 27, 2015
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/27 5:15 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. (Messerly, Loren)
Related: [-]
12 12 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 08/27 5:03 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08143 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5629185. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#11
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/27 5:02 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert P. Franke Filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. (Messerly, Loren)
Related: [-]
10 10 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 08/27 4:57 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08143 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5629150. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#9
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/27 4:54 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew G. Edson Filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. (Messerly, Loren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Wed 08/12 4:46 PM
Consent Filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc.. (Messerly, Loren)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
7 7 misc Consent Mon 08/03 2:10 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
6 6 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/30 11:19 AM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
5 5 motion Stipulation Fri 07/24 10:24 AM
Stipulation Between Chapter 7 Trustee and Flowserve Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. (Messerly, Loren)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/29 10:29 AM
Summons Service Executed on Flowserve US, Inc., a/k/a Flowserve Pump Division 6/26/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08143 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 06/26 8:56 AM
Summons Issued on Flowserve US, Inc., a/k/a Flowserve Pump Division Date Issued 6/26/2015, Answer Due 7/27/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/26/2015, Answer Due 7/27/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/24 4:48 PM
Adversary case 15-08143 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Flowserve US, Inc., a/k/a Flowserve Pump Division, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons