Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08150
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kloch-Glitsch LP
4111 East 37th St. North
Wichita, KS 67220
Represented By
Kloch-Glitsch LP
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/31 5:08 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8150 Judgment For - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8150 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
17 17 order Stipulated Order Mon 01/30 4:37 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/30/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
16 16 motion Stipulation Wed 01/18 3:54 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
15 15 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 10:08 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
14 14 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 2:17 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number12 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 12 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:09 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 11:08 AM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
11 11 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:41 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2015
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 09/03 4:04 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Per the PDF Complaint, the Defendant's name was corrected on the docket to: Koch-Glitsch from Kloch-Glitsch. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins
Wednesday, August 19, 2015
10 10 motion Dismiss Wed 08/19 1:13 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Defendant Kloch-Glitsch LP (Cheney, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
9 9 misc Consent Wed 08/12 11:50 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant Kloch-Glitsch LP. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
8 8 motion Extend Time Tue 08/11 3:31 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant Kloch-Glitsch LP (Cheney, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
7 7 misc Consent Mon 08/03 2:15 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
6 6 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/30 11:26 AM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
5 5 notice Notice Tue 07/21 11:21 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Defendant Kloch-Glitsch LP. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/29 11:31 AM
Summons Service Executed on Kloch-Glitsch LP 6/26/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08150 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 06/26 9:16 AM
Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/26/2015, Answer Due 7/27/2015; Kloch-Glitsch LP Date Issued 6/26/2015, Answer Due 7/27/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/24 5:41 PM
Adversary case 15-08150 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Kloch-Glitsch LP, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons