Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08152
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
HDR Engineering, Inc.
3867 S. 175th Avenue
Omaha, NE 68130
Represented By
HDR Engineering, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/31 5:10 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8152 Judgment For - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8152 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
25 25 order Stipulated Order Mon 01/30 4:38 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/30/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 24
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
24 24 motion Stipulation Tue 01/24 3:42 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
23 23 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 10:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
22 22 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 2:18 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number20 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 20 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:11 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 11:18 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 11:18 AM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
19 19 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:42 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2015
18 18 order Withdrawal of Reference Fri 10/16 7:31 AM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+] . The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and dispositive motions. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill 10/7/2015. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (drh)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, September 28, 2015
17 17 notice Notice Mon 09/28 10:24 AM
The District Court misc file has closed; A civil case has been opened: 4:15-cv-00446-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by Dana R. Hoyle, Deputy Clerk. (drh)
Related: [-] 14 Notice 14 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08245-BLW. No PDF Attached (related documents12 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) Filed by (RE: related document(s)12 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant HDR Engineering, Inc.). (drh)
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
16 16 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 09/23 2:38 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Defendant HDR Engineering, Inc.. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2015
15 15 misc Statement of Compliance Mon 09/14 2:20 PM
Statement of Compliance Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic)
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
14 14 notice Notice Tue 08/25 12:21 PM
Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08245-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference12 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant HDR Engineering, Inc.
Friday, August 21, 2015
13 13 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 08/21 2:25 PM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-08152 JDP) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5620531. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#12
12 12 motion Withdrawal of Reference Fri 08/21 2:24 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant HDR Engineering, Inc. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/21 2:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant HDR Engineering, Inc. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2015
10 10 misc Consent Mon 08/10 9:25 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2015
9 9 court Court's Certificate of Service Fri 08/07 2:04 PM
Court's Certificate of Service re 7 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application,8 Order (Generic) A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: T. Randall Wright, Esq.. Baird Holm LLP 1700 Farnam St, Ste 1500 Omaha, NE 68102-2068 Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant HDR Engineering, Inc., 8 Order (Generic)
8 8 order Order (Generic) Fri 08/07 2:04 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 8/7/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 08/07 1:58 PM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant T. Randall Wright by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/7/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 5
6 6 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 08/07 10:59 AM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08152 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5603177. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#5
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/07 10:58 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Defendant HDR Engineering, Inc. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/29 11:36 AM
Summons Service Executed on HDR Engineering, Inc. 6/26/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08152 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 06/26 9:19 AM
Summons Issued on HDR Engineering, Inc. Date Issued 6/26/2015, Answer Due 7/27/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/26/2015, Answer Due 7/27/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/24 5:56 PM
Adversary case 15-08152 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against HDR Engineering, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons