Winthrop Resources Corporation v. Hannibal Industries, Inc.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | John R Tunheim |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-02808 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 22, 2015 8:04 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
Hannibal Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Winthrop Resources Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hannibal Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winthrop Resources Corporation
11100 Wayzata Boulevard Suite 800
Minnetonka, MN 55305 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
51 | 51
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Tue 08/09 11:00 AM
JUDGMENT. (lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
50 | 50
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/09 10:05 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on August 9, 2016. (HAZ) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
49 | 49
service
Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
Fri 08/05 10:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Winthrop Resources Corporation re48 Stipulation of Dismissal (McBride, Matthew) |
|
48 | 48
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/05 10:15 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Winthrop Resources Corporation. (McBride, Matthew). Jointly signed by parties. Modified on 8/5/2016 (las) |