Member Case
Lead case is: 4:11-bk-46906

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:D Michael Lynn
Case #: 4:11-bk-46963
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Jan 12, 2012
Terminated:May 03, 2013

Debtor
Academy Foot & Ankle Specialists, P.A.
1940 E State Highway 114 Ste 150
Southlake, TX 76092-6526
Represented By
St. Clair Newbern, III
Law Offices Of St.Clair Newbern Iii, P.C
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
UST U.S. Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Friday, May 03, 2013
Bankruptcy case closed. (Maldino, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2013
76 76 Order granting motion for final decree Related [+] Entered on 4/30/2013. (Chambers, Deanna) (3 pgs)
Related: [-] 74