Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-99000

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Cecelia G Morris
Case #: 1:10-ap-05120
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2010
Terminated:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Oreades SICAV represented by its Liquidator Inter Investissements S.A.
Represented By
Oreades SICAV represented by its Liquidator Inter Investissements S.A.
contact info
Defendant
Inter Investissements S.A. (f/k/a Inter Conseil S.A.)
Represented By
Andrew J. Ehrlich
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff
Represented By
Nicholas Cremona
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Deborah H. Renner
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
David J. Sheehan
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Regina Griffin
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Marc E. Hirschfield
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 05 2018
Written Opinion Signed On 6/5/2018 Re: Memorandum Decision Denying The Trustee's Motion For Discovery Pursuant To Rule 26(d) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedures,(Related Lead Case#08-01789 ECF Docs.#16927, #17283, #4072, #7827, #16428, #7828, #16724, #16924, #3083). (Mercado, Tracey)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, November 15, 2024
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/15 11:41 AM
Adversary Case 1:10-ap-5120 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
193 193 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/12 1:47 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Benjamin D. Pergament on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Pergament, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 192
192 192 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 11/12 11:15 AM
Notice of Dismissal /Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Benjamin D. Pergament on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Pergament, Benjamin)
Related: [-]