Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-27091

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eugene R Wedoff
Case #: 1:15-ap-00430
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2015
Terminated:Sep 24, 2015
Last checked: never
Defendant
ALLIED BARTON SECURITY
Represented By
ALLIED BARTON SECURITY
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard M Fogel, Richard M. Fogel, as Liquidating Trustee for the Liquidation Trust of West Side Community Hospital, Inc., et al.
321 N Clark St. #800
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
John W Guzzardo
Shaw Fishman Glantz & Towbin LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, September 24, 2015
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Thu 09/24 8:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-430 Closed . (Mendoza, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
9 9 order Default Thu 09/24 8:51 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default Related [+], Granting Motion For Default Judgment. Signed on 9/23/2015. (Mendoza, Catherine)
Related: [-] 8 8
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
8 8 motion Default Wed 09/16 10:33 AM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Default, Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by John W Guzzardo on behalf of Richard M Fogel. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2015 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 744, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Guzzardo, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, September 14, 2015
7 7 utility U - Corrective Entry Mon 09/14 11:15 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY Incorrect Event Entered, Filer to be Notified to file an Amended Motion Related [+]. (Sims, Mildred)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, September 11, 2015
6 6 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/11 2:34 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Default Judgment Filed by John W Guzzardo on behalf of Richard M Fogel. Hearing scheduled for 9/23/2015 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 744, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Guzzardo, John) Modified on 9/14/2015 Incorrect Event Entered, Filer to be Notified to file an Amended Motion (Sims, Mildred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
5 5 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 08/26 10:55 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 09/23/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 744 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/26/2015. (Smith, Lester)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/01 10:03 AM
Summons Service Executed on ALLIED BARTON SECURITY Related [+]. (Guzzardo, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, June 26, 2015
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 06/26 2:25 PM
Receipt of Complaint 15-00430 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29564417. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 06/26 12:19 PM
Summons Issued on ALLIED BARTON SECURITY Answer Due 07/27/2015 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/26 12:19 PM
Adversary case 15-00430 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Richard M Fogel against ALLIED BARTON SECURITY. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 8/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 744, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Guzzardo, John)
Related: [-]