Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08153
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2015
Terminated:Dec 19, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bannock County and Radene Barker, Bannock County Treasurer
524 E. Center, Room 211
Pocatello, ID 83201
Represented By
Bannock County and Radene Barker, Bannock County Treasurer
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, December 19, 2016
18 18 order Dismissing Case Mon 12/19 3:32 PM
Order Dismissing Case Signed on 12/19/2016. (drh)
Related: [-]
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Mon 12/19 3:34 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8153 Judgment For N/A; Case Settled, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8153 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
17 17 audio Tue 12/13 6:05 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/12/2016 2:38:11 PM ]. File Size [ 544 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:16 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Mon 12/12 4:02 PM
Hearing Held Appearances: Jason Naess for Plaintiff; Jared Johnson for Defendant Report of Proceedings: Comments by Mr. Naess and Mr. Johnson, with questions by the Court. After discussion, the Court accepts the oral stipulation to dismiss by counsel. Mr. Naess to submit a dismissal order approved by Mr. Johnson. [ESR: PF] Audio File Location: POC-CTRMB Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins
Friday, November 25, 2016
15 15 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 10:10 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
14 14 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 2:20 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number11 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 11 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Friday, November 04, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 11/04 9:36 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Dana R. Hoyle, Courtroom Deputy Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 12/12/2016 at 01:30 PM at Pocatello - US Courthouse, Bankruptcy/Magistrate Courtroom. (drh)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 15-08153 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer): Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Bannock County and Radene Barker, Bannock County Treasurer, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet # 2 Supplement Summons) filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:12 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 11:25 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 11:25 AM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2016
10 10 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 01/14 3:09 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Ian N Service Terminated Filed by Defendants Bannock County, Radene Barker. (Johnson, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
9 9 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:42 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Tue 08/04 11:04 AM
Consent Filed by Defendants Bannock County, Radene Barker. (Service, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
7 7 misc Consent Mon 08/03 2:16 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
6 6 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/30 11:27 AM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/28 11:25 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendants Bannock County, Radene Barker (Service, Ian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/30 5:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bannock County 6/30/2015; Radene Barker 6/30/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 06/29 2:04 PM
Summons Issued on Bannock County Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015; Radene Barker Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08153 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/26 11:30 AM
Adversary case 15-08153 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Bannock County and Radene Barker, Bannock County Treasurer, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons