Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08154
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2015
Terminated:Jan 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Intermountain Gas Company
555 S. Cole Road
Pocatello, ID 83709
Represented By
Intermountain Gas Company
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/17 4:20 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8154 Judgment For Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8154 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
16 16 order Stipulated Order Fri 01/13 5:00 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Stipulation Fri 01/13 3:51 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
14 14 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 10:11 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
13 13 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 2:22 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number11 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 11 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:13 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 11 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 11:30 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 11:29 AM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
10 10 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:43 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
9 9 misc Consent Mon 08/03 2:17 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Thu 07/30 2:53 PM
Consent Filed by Defendant Intermountain Gas Company. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/30 1:07 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/29 3:25 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Intermountain Gas Company (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/20 9:14 AM
Notice of Appearance by R Ron Kerl Filed by Defendant Intermountain Gas Company. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/30 5:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on Intermountain Gas Company 6/30/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 06/29 2:10 PM
Summons Issued on Intermountain Gas Company Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08154 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/26 11:57 AM
Adversary case 15-08154 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Intermountain Gas Company, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons