Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08155
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2015
Terminated:Feb 03, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
ABB, Inc.
16250 W. Glendale Drive
New Berlin, WI 53201
Represented By
ABB, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, February 03, 2017
28 28 order Stipulated Order Fri 02/03 10:04 AM
Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 2/3/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 27
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Fri 02/03 10:11 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8155 Judgment For N/A - Case Settled., Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8155 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2017
27 27 motion Stipulation Thu 02/02 3:58 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
26 26 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 10:12 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 22
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
25 25 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 2:24 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number22 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 22 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
24 24 notice Notice Wed 11/02 2:23 PM
Notice of Non-Objection to Motion to Substitute Party Related [+] Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.. (Mushlitz, Douglas)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Substitute Party22 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:14 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 11:36 AM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 11:36 AM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
21 21 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:44 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2015
20 20 order Withdrawal of Reference Fri 10/16 7:40 AM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+] . The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and dispositive motions. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill 10/7/2015. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (drh)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
19 19 notice Notice Tue 09/08 12:25 PM
The District Court misc file has closed; A civil case has been opened: 4:15-cv-00355-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 16 Notice 16 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08234-BLW. No PDF Attached (related documents13 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) Filed by (RE: related document(s)13 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.). (drh)
18 18 misc Statement of Compliance Tue 09/08 10:04 AM
Statement of Compliance Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc. Related [+]. (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/26 4:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc. (Mushlitz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2015
16 16 notice Notice Tue 08/18 4:43 PM
Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08234-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference13 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.
Thursday, August 13, 2015
15 15 misc Memorandum Thu 08/13 5:02 PM
Memorandum Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc. Related [+]. (Mushlitz, Douglas)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176
14 14 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 08/13 4:59 PM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-08155 JDP) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5610943. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#13
13 13 motion Withdrawal of Reference Thu 08/13 4:54 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc. (Mushlitz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
12 12 misc Consent Mon 08/03 2:18 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 01, 2015
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order Sat 08/01 10:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stipulated Order Notice Date 08/01/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
10 10 misc Returned Mail Fri 07/31 2:41 PM
Returned mail received for Does 1-10 ***NO PDF ATTACHED*** Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Stipulation
Thursday, July 30, 2015
9 9 order Stipulated Order Thu 07/30 2:47 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Answer [to August 26, 2015] Related [+] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/30 1:08 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Stipulation Thu 07/30 9:39 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Extend Deadline to File Answer Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.. (Mushlitz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorney Thu 07/30 1:50 PM
Attorney Ron T Blewett for ABB, Inc. added to case (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 07/29 2:20 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.. (Mushlitz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/29 2:18 PM
Notice of Appearance by Douglas L Mushlitz Filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.. (Mushlitz, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/30 5:19 PM
Summons Service Executed on ABB, Inc. 6/30/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 06/29 2:17 PM
Summons Issued on ABB, Inc. Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08155 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/26 12:14 PM
Adversary case 15-08155 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against ABB, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons