Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08163
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bruker Optics, Inc., a Delaware corporation
19 Fortune Drive
Billerica, MA 01821
Represented By
Bruker Optics, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/31 5:17 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8163 Judgment For - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8163 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
17 17 order Stipulated Order Mon 01/30 4:40 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/30/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
16 16 motion Stipulation Wed 01/18 4:00 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
15 15 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 10:41 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
14 14 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 2:30 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number12 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 12 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:20 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 1:29 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 1:28 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
11 11 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:48 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2015
10 10 misc Consent Mon 08/17 8:38 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2015
9 9 order Order (Generic) Thu 08/13 2:50 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 8/13/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Wed 08/12 12:00 PM
Consent Filed by Defendant Bruker Optics, Inc.. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 08/12 11:58 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Defendant Bruker Optics, Inc.. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/12 11:58 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Bruker Optics, Inc. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
5 5 motion Stipulation Tue 07/14 9:46 AM
Stipulation Between R. Sam Hopkins and Bruker Optics, Inc. to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/30 5:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bruker Optics, Inc. 6/30/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 06/29 4:12 PM
Summons Issued on Bruker Optics, Inc. Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/29/2015, Answer Due 7/29/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08163 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/26 3:46 PM
Adversary case 15-08163 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Bruker Optics, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons