Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08171
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company
1550 James Road
Bakersfield, CA 93308
Represented By
TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/31 5:32 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8171 Judgment For - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8171 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
24 24 order Stipulated Order Mon 01/30 4:42 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/30/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
23 23 motion Stipulation Wed 01/18 4:04 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
22 22 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 1:51 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 19
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
21 21 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 3:12 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number19 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 19 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:27 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 2:16 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 2:16 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
18 18 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 11:55 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 16, 2015
17 17 order Withdrawal of Reference Fri 10/16 7:22 AM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+] . The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and dispositive motions. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill 10/7/2015. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (drh)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, September 11, 2015
16 16 notice Notice Fri 09/11 1:19 PM
The District Court misc file has closed; A civil case has been opened: 4:15-cv-00417-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by Dana R Hoyle, Deputy Clerk. (drh)
Related: [-] 14 Notice 14 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08225-BLW. No PDF Attached (related documents10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) Filed by (RE: related document(s)10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company). (drh)
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
15 15 misc Statement of Compliance Tue 09/01 4:29 PM
Statement of Compliance Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Friday, August 14, 2015
14 14 notice Notice Fri 08/14 10:50 AM
Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08225-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
13 13 answer Response Wed 08/12 1:52 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Defendant TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
12 12 misc Support Brief/Memorandum Wed 08/12 1:39 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Filed by Defendant TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company Related [+]. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176
11 11 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 08/12 1:34 PM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-08171 JDP) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5608561. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
10 10 motion Withdrawal of Reference Wed 08/12 1:30 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/12 1:29 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Mon 08/03 2:26 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
7 7 order Order (Generic) Thu 07/30 1:20 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/30/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2015
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 07/20 11:07 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Defendant TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Mon 07/20 11:06 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Defendant TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/30 5:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company 6/30/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 06/30 10:03 AM
Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/30/2015, Answer Due 7/30/2015; TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company Date Issued 6/30/2015, Answer Due 7/30/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 06/29 6:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08171 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5550734. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, June 26, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/26 5:04 PM
Adversary case 15-08171 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against TIC - The Industrial Company d/b/a The Industrial Company, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons