Britt Stoker v. Logmein, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-01258 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 26, 2015 3:40 AM PST |
Defendant
Logmein, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Britt Stoker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties this matter is dismissed with prejudice as to the named Plaintiff, and without prejudice as to the Putative Class alleged in the complaint, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dgon) |
|
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Britt Stoker.(Friedman, Todd) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 01, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer13 , by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Having considered the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed on August 26, 2015, and finding that good cause exists, the Court hereby ORDERS that the following briefing schedule shall apply: 1. LogMeIn will file a Motion to Transfer no later than August 31, 2015; 2. Plaintiff will file its opposition brief, if any, no later than two weeks after LogMeIn submits the Motion to Transfer; 3. LogMeIn will file its reply brief, if any, no later than one week after Plaintiff files its opposition brief; 4. Before filing the Motion to Transfer, LogMeIn will confer with Plaintiff to select a date for oral argument, if the Court determines a hearing is appropriate, on the next date upon which both the Court and the Parties are available; 5. If the Court denies LogMeIns Motion to Transfer, LogMeIn will have three weeks from the date of the Courts order to file a Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiff will have three weeks to file an opposition brief, and LogMeIn will have two weeks to file a reply brief. (bm) |
|
16 | 16
![]() ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: MOTION FOR APPEARANCE PRO HAC VICE12 , for the following reasons: Attorney's staff is not permitted to sign the application. See LR11-1. Fiscal clerk to return fee to counsel. (bm) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Britt Stoker. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney William J. Trach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16334599 paid.)12 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signature on Application. Local counsel failed to sign the application. Staff signed. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Logmein, Inc..(Glennon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() APPLICATION for attorney William J. Trach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16334599 paid.) filed by Defendant Logmein, Inc.. (Attorney Brian T Glennon added to party Logmein, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Glennon, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO FILE A MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (L.R. 23-3)10 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, good cause appearing, that: 1. Plaintiff's deadline to file a Motion for Class Certification, pursuant to Local Rule 23-3, is hereby vacated; 2. Plaintiff's class certification deadline shall be set during the InitialScheduling Conference. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification from September 29, 2015 to TBD filed by Plaintiff Britt Stoker.(Bacon, Adrian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Britt Stoker. upon Logmein, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/1/2015, answer due 8/30/2015. Waiver of Service signed by James H. Moon. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) |
|
7 | 7
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Logmein Inc. (ad) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ad) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ad) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Britt Stoker. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Britt Stoker, (Friedman, Todd) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Britt Stoker. (Friedman, Todd) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15991078 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Britt Stoker. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Britt Stoker(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) |