Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert Holmes Bell
Case #: 1:15-cv-00690
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2015
Terminated:Mar 14, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Dec 27, 2015 6:44 AM EST
defendant
County of Allegan
defendant
Allegan, County of
Represented By
Shaina R. Reed
Johnson, Rosati, Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
James L. Dyer
Johnson, Rosati, Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
defendant
Blaine Koops
Represented By
Shaina R. Reed
Johnson, Rosati, Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
James L. Dyer
Johnson, Rosati, Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
defendant
Michael Pallett
Represented By
Shaina R. Reed
Johnson, Rosati, Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
James L. Dyer
Johnson, Rosati, Schultz & Joppich, P.C.
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Stephen M. Denenfeld
Lewis Reed & Allen PC
contact info
plaintiff
Michael S. Clark, Jr.
Represented By
Sean W. Drew
Drew Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 14, 2016
21 21 order Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Mon 03/14 12:42 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss20 ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/14 8:33 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal corrected [executed] Joint Stipulation for Dismissal by plaintiff Michael S. Clark, Jr (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/14 8:25 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal by plaintiff Michael S. Clark, Jr (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2015
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Thu 11/12 2:25 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 51068 as to plaintiff Michael S. Clark, Jr (lep)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2015
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Fri 11/06 2:16 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 1517 as to defendants Allegan, County of, Blaine Koops, Michael Pallett (lep)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2015
18 18 service Proof of Service Thu 10/29 10:10 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Allegan, County of, Blaine Koops, Michael Pallett service of Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures & Defendants' First Voluntary Document Disclosure (Dyer, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2015
17 17 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Wed 10/28 4:50 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Stephen M. Denenfeld ; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 11/4/2015 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 11/4/2015 (lep)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2015
adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Fri 10/23 10:25 AM
SELECTION of Stephen M. Denenfeld as facilitative mediator by ADR Administrator (lep)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
16 16 service Proof of Service Fri 10/02 2:18 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Michael S. Clark, Jr Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2015
15 15 order Case Management Order Mon 09/14 3:36 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: final pretrial conference set for 2/10/2017 at 1:15 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell; jury trial set for 2/21/2017 at 9:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Mon 09/14 11:30 AM
MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Court Reporter: Kevin Gaugier) (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
13 13 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Thu 09/10 7:55 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2015
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/27 2:12 PM
NOTICE Plaintiffs Notice of Unavailability by plaintiff Michael S. Clark, Jr (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2015
11 11 order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Wed 08/12 1:44 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell; status report due by 9/9/2015 ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
10 10 order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Tue 08/11 4:36 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell; status report due by 9/9/2015 ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 08/11 2:54 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint8 with affirmative defenses and jury demand Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Violation of Federal Civil Rights, 42 U.S.C. 1983 and Demand for Trial by Jury and Defendants' Affirmative Defenses by Allegan, County of, Blaine Koops, Michael Pallett (Dyer, James)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 08/11 2:51 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Shaina R. Reed on behalf of defendants Allegan, County of, Blaine Koops, Michael Pallett Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Shaina
Friday, August 07, 2015
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 08/07 11:15 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James L. Dyer on behalf of defendants Allegan, County of, Blaine Koops, Michael Pallett (Dyer, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2015
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/15 1:22 PM
Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michael S. Clark, Jr (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 07/02 3:31 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Blaine Koops (ns)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Thu 07/02 2:39 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Thu 07/02 2:31 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 07/02 2:08 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Allegan, County of, Michael Pallett (ald)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Thu 07/02 1:11 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
service Summons Not Issued Wed 07/01 8:22 AM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Allegan, County of, Blaine Koops, Michael Pallett (none provided) (cmi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 06/30 9:03 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Robert Holmes Bell (krv)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/30 6:28 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Michael S. Clark, Jr. (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Tue 06/30 6:33 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Michael S. Clark, Jr. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-3241325 (Drew, Sean)
Related: [-]