New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert B Kugler
Referred: Joel Schneider
Case #: 1:15-cv-04831
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2015
Terminated:Feb 10, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Dec 27, 2015 11:09 AM EST
Defendant
DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.
Defendant
DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS, INC.
Defendant
DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.
Defendant
FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC
Defendant
FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant
FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.
In Re
BENICAR (OLMESARTAN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
THERESA MOORE
Represented By
LAURA L. PITTNER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
5 5 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/10 11:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by THERESA MOORE. (PITTNER, LAURA)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/10 1:34 PM
***Civil Case Terminated*** (js)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2016
4 4 order Order Tue 01/19 3:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 19. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02606-RBK-JS et al.(TH, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2016
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/04 6:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by THERESA MOORE. All Defendants. (PITTNER, LAURA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/30 7:13 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *DEANNA WALL* (drw, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/30 7:12 PM
COMPLAINT against DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO U.S. HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., FOREST LABORATORIES, LLC, FOREST PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., FOREST RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6486543) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THERESA MOORE.(drw, )
Related: [-]