Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08180
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2015
Terminated:Jun 21, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vision Electric GmbH
Represented By
Vision Electric GmbH
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 06/21 10:18 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8180 Judgment For N/A; settled, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8180 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2016
15 15 notice Notice Mon 06/20 3:44 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2016
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 05/11 11:10 AM
Summons Service Executed on EMS Elektro Metall Schwanenmuhle GmbH, as successor in interest to Vision Electric GmbH 3/9/2016 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2016
12 12 court Summons Issued Mon 01/04 3:31 PM
Another Summons Issued on EMS Elektro Metall Schwanenmuhle GmbH, as successor in interest to Vision Electric GmbH Date Issued 1/4/2016, Answer Due 2/3/2016; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 1/4/2016, Answer Due 2/3/2016 (nl)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Complaint (Amended) Mon 01/04 1:38 PM
Amended Complaint by Robert J Maynes on behalf of R. Sam Hopkins against all defendants. Related [+]. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 15-08180 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer): Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Vision Electric GmbH, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet # 2 Supplement Summons) filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins
Att: 1 Supplement First Amended Adversary Cover Sheet
10 10 order Amend Mon 01/04 11:13 AM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion To Amend Complaint Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] Related Doc #9
Friday, January 01, 2016
9 9 motion Amend Fri 01/01 12:45 PM
Motion to Amend (Ex Parte) Complaint Related [+] (Ex Parte) Complaint Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, October 01, 2015
8 8 order Extend Time Thu 10/01 11:45 AM
Order Granting Second Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint - Extended to January 5, 2016 Related [+] Signed on 10/1/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
7 7 motion Extend Time Wed 09/30 12:00 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
6 6 order Extend Time Wed 08/26 4:16 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint [October 5, 2015] Related [+] Signed on 8/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
5 5 motion Extend Time Wed 07/08 1:52 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2015
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 07/07 3:28 PM
Another Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 7/7/2015, Answer Due 8/6/2015; Vision Electric GmbH Date Issued 7/7/2015, Answer Due 8/6/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 07/02 12:33 PM
Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 7/2/2015, Answer Due 8/3/2015; Vision Electric GmbH Date Issued 7/2/2015, Answer Due 8/3/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 07/02 5:50 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08180 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5556346. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/01 10:46 AM
Adversary case 15-08180 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Vision Electric GmbH, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons