Aldrich et al v. The University of Phoenix, Inc.
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph H Mckinley, Jr |
Referred: | Colin H Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00578 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441wt Removal- Employment (Wrongful Termination) |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 28, 2015 9:15 AM EST |
Defendant
The University of Phoenix, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marlena Aldrich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristen Nolan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 11/16 9:40 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to43 Order from the 6CCA Affirming the District Court's decision re42 Notice of Appeal. (JBM) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/24 4:06 PM
NOTICE FROM THE 6CCA: OPINION filed : The district court's judgment is AFFIRMED, decision not for publication. (Mandate to issue) (JBM) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 03/09 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to41 Judgment by Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0644-2178323. (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 03/04 11:15 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of The University of Phoenix, Inc. against Kristen Nolan, Marlena Aldrich. The Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. cc: counsel (JBM) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 03/04 11:14 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/4/2016. cc: Counsel (JBM) |
|
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration Order on Motion to Alter Judgment Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/04 11:13 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying20 Motion for Reconsideration; denying22 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/4/2016. cc: Counsel (JBM) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Fri 03/04 11:11 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying35 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/4/2016. cc: Counsel (JBM) |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
4
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 03/01 1:45 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re35 MOTION to Strike26 Reply, filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. Replies due by 3/18/2016. (Inman, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
36 | 36
4
pgs
respm
Response to Objections
Tue 03/01 1:44 PM
Response to Objections re34 Objection of Plaintiffs to Magistrate Judge's Order filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. (Inman, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
motion
Strike
Tue 02/16 2:33 PM
MOTION to Strike26 Reply, by Plaintiffs Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan Responses due by 3/11/2016 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
34 | 34
8
pgs
respm
Objection
Tue 02/16 2:29 PM
Objection to33 Order on Motion for Leave to,, Order on Motion to Supplement,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan. (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 03, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Order on Motion to Supplement Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 02/03 4:50 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. denying27 Motion for Leave to file a Sur-Reply; denying as moot29 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement their tendered sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/3/2016. cc: Counsel (JBM) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
4
pgs
respm
Reply Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 01/22 12:57 PM
REPLY re27 MOTION for Leave to file sur reply ,31 Response to Motion , REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan. (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Tue 01/12 8:54 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re30 Objection ; Error:INCORRECT event selected by Counsel; Correction:Correct event selected and documents refiled by Clerk. Please see DN31 for full viewing. (DJT) |
||
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
8
pgs
respm
Objection
Tue 01/05 3:21 PM
Objection to27 MOTION for Leave to file sur reply filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. (Inman, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, December 19, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Supplement
Sat 12/19 12:23 PM
MOTION to Supplement re27 Motion for Leave to, by Plaintiffs Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan Responses due by 1/14/2016 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Marlena Aldirch | ||
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
7
pgs
respm
Reply Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 12/17 3:45 PM
REPLY re25 Response to Motion,20 MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Leave to, MOTION to Alter Judgment , REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan. (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Leave to
Tue 12/15 8:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to file sur reply by Plaintiffs Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan Responses due by 1/8/2016 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 19 pgs Reply Tendered Sur Reply, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Acknowledgment Form, | ||
Att: 4 5 pgs Exhibit Nolan Supplemental Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit Aldrich Supplemental Affidavit | ||
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply
Mon 11/30 7:51 PM
REPLY re24 Response to Motion,6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. (Inman, J.) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit One -- Declaration of Quintana, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit A to Declaration -- Handbook Excerpt, | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit B to Declaration -- Email | ||
25 | 25
7
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 11/30 6:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re20 MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Leave to, MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. Replies due by 12/17/2015. (Inman, J.) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 11/13 7:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration filed by Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan. Replies due by 11/30/2015. (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Acknowledgment Form--Aldrich, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit Acknowledgment Form--Nolan, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Aldrich, | ||
Att: 5 5 pgs Affidavit Nolan | ||
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
5
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 11/10 4:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration ,20 MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Lea filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. Replies due by 11/27/2015. (Mayo, LaToi) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 05, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 11/05 12:25 PM
MOTION re20 MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Leave to, MOTION to Alter Judgment by Plaintiffs Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan Responses due by 11/30/2015 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 11/05 12:22 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration ,20 MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Leave to, MOTION to Alter Judgment,19 Order, Schedules - Motion and R&R Deadlines by Plaintiffs Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan Responses due by 11/16/2015 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 04, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 11/04 6:36 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Motion for Hearing,, Order on Motion for Leave to, by Plaintiffs Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan Responses due by 11/30/2015 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Schedules - Motion and R&R Deadlines
Tue 10/20 3:44 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/20/2015 re:6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration: Responses due by 11/13/2015, Replies due by 11/27/2015.cc:counsel (JBM) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply
Fri 10/09 1:40 PM
SUR-REPLY re7 MOTION to Remand filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. (JBM) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion for Leave to
Fri 10/09 1:33 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand7 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply14 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall file the tendered Sur-Reply attached to Defendant's Motion14 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument13 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 10/9/2015. cc: Counsel(JBM) |
|
Monday, September 14, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 09/14 1:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan. Replies due by 10/1/2015. (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 08, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/08 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED ORDER by The University of Phoenix, Inc. re14 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Inman, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Leave to
Fri 09/04 5:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendant The University of Phoenix, Inc. Responses due by 9/28/2015 (Mayo, LaToi) |
|
Att: 1 Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand | ||
Monday, August 31, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Hearing
Mon 08/31 12:06 PM
MOTION for Oral Argument re12 Reply to Response to Motion,11 Response to Motion,7 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Marlena Aldrich Responses due by 9/24/2015 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 08/31 12:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Remand filed by Marlena Aldrich. (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant's Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Revised Fee Affidavit | ||
Friday, August 14, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 08/14 7:41 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Remand and for Costs and Fees filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. Replies due by 8/31/2015. (Inman, J.) |
|
Thursday, July 30, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/30 2:42 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension (DN8 ) is granted. The deadline by which Plaintiffs must file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DN6 ) is stayed pending a ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (DN7 ). cc: Counsel (JAC) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 07/29 10:10 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. Replies due by 8/17/2015. (Mayo, LaToi) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/22 4:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration by Plaintiffs Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan Responses due by 8/3/2015 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Remand
Wed 07/22 3:24 PM
MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Marlena Aldrich, Kristen Nolan Responses due by 8/17/2015 (Hoskins, Kirk) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 17 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, July 08, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/08 4:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration by Defendant The University of Phoenix, Inc. Responses due by 8/3/2015 (Mayo, LaToi) |
|
Att: 1 16 pgs Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit One to Memorandum - Declaration of Tartaglio, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Tartaglio Declaration - Aldrich Acknowledgement, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit B to Tartaglio Declaration - Nolan Acknowledgement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Tartaglio Declaration - ADR Policy, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/01 4:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re1 Notice of Removal. (DJT) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/01 4:36 PM
ORDER (EBOC) by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 7/1/15: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable COLIN H. LINDSAY, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. cc:counsel (DJT) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/01 4:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Apollo Group, Inc. for The University of Phoenix, Inc.. (DJT) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Wed 07/01 4:33 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. Magistrate designation: Colin H. Lindsay. (DJT) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/01 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The University of Phoenix, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 15-CI-002839. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2036888, filed by The University of Phoenix, Inc.. (DJT) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Ormont Declaration |