Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08188
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
CT Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of Wolters Kluwer United States, Inc, a New York corporation
1350 Treat Blvd, Suite 100
Walnut Creek, CA 94597
Represented By
CT Corporation
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/31 5:38 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8188 Judgment For - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8188 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
20 20 order Stipulated Order Mon 01/30 4:44 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/30/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
19 19 motion Stipulation Wed 01/25 10:01 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2016
18 18 order Substitute Party Fri 11/25 2:39 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/25/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
17 17 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 3:23 PM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number15 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 15 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Thursday, October 27, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Thu 10/27 11:47 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 3:09 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Substitute Party Wed 10/26 3:09 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
14 14 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 12:02 PM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
13 13 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 09/23 4:11 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Defendant CT Corporation. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Response Wed 09/23 2:24 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) 5 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP)
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
11 11 misc Consent Wed 09/16 10:10 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant CT Corporation. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Stipulation Wed 09/16 10:08 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant Regarding Consent Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(E) Filed by Defendant CT Corporation. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/16 10:05 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant CT Corporation (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Wed 09/09 8:30 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
7 7 order Order (Generic) Tue 09/08 11:28 AM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 9/8/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
6 6 motion Stipulation Wed 09/02 10:45 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant CT Corporation. (Schwager, Sheila)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP) Wed 09/02 9:00 AM
Notice of Conditional Dismissal UPON EXAMINATION of the record herein, the Court finds that cause exists to believe that the parties are NOT diligently prosecuting this adversary case. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that pursuant to Local Rule 7041.1 relating to dismissal in inactive cases, the above entitled case will be DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION unless a party takes further action in accordance with Local Rule 7041.1(a). Elizabeth A. Smith, Clerk of Court This is the Official Notice from the Court. No Document is attached Adversary Action due by 9/23/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/08 9:15 AM
Summons Service Executed on CT Corporation 7/6/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 07/02 12:46 PM
Summons Issued on CT Corporation Date Issued 7/2/2015, Answer Due 8/3/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 7/2/2015, Answer Due 8/3/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 07/02 5:50 AM
Receipt of Complaint 15-08188 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5556346. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/01 2:33 PM
Adversary case 15-08188 14 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against CT Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of Wolters Kluwer United States, Inc. a New York Corp, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons