New Jersey District Court
Judge:Katharine S Hayden
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:15-cv-05193
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 30, 2015 8:07 AM EST
Defendant
LAWRENCE G. ROMO
Represented By
MEGAN ANNE CROWLEY
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
SELECTIVE SERVICE SYSTEM
Represented By
MEGAN ANNE CROWLEY
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Notice Only
ROY DEN HOLLANDER
Plaintiff
ALLISON MARIE KYLE
Represented By
MICHAEL JOHN DAHER
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2018
OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/29/2018. (ld, )
GPO Mar 04 2019
OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/4/2019. (sm)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
150 150 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JAMES RISING on behalf of All Defendants (RISING, ANDREW)
Related: [-]