New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shelley C Chapman
Case #: 1:11-bk-15939
Case Filed:Dec 30, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Feb 02, 2012
Claims Deadline:Jun 08, 2012
Terminated:Jun 30, 2015

Debtor
Inverness Distribution Limited
Hogan Lovells US LLP 875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Ira S. Greene
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Robin Elizabeth Keller
Lovells LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Andrew D. Velez-Rivera
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
Elisabetta Gasparini
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 06/30 3:34 PM
Case Closed. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]