PacerMonitor
A Fitch Solutions Service
Features
Plans & Pricing
About
Home
Features
Pricing
Getting Started
About Us
Start Free Trial
Sign In
Admin Login
USA vs Uptain
Wyoming District Court
Case #:
3:15-po-00490
Case Filed:
Jul 06, 2015
Terminated:
Aug 20, 2015
Docket
Parties
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 7:30 AM MDT
Monday, July 06, 2015
1
1
Citation Issued as to Mark T Uptain (1) count(s) 1. (CVB Auto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1
Original Ticket,
Att: 2
Additional Probable Cause
2
2
Initial Appearance set for
07/21/2015
09:00 AM in JACK before Honorable Mark L Carman. (CVB Auto)
Related: [-]
Continue to Create Account